EP3552066 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ISSUE DETECTION OF INDUSTRIAL PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANDHI, Devang, Jagdish 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA 30339 / US | 02 /
HEDA, Sanjeev, Shyam 4200 Wildwood Parkway 3-6C-02 Atlanta, GA 30339 / US | 03 /
JIANG, Xiaomo 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA 30339 / US | 04 /
WILE, Bradley 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA 30339 / US | 05 /
METZ, Kevin 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA 30339-8402 / US | 06 /
D'AMATO, James, John 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA 30339-8402 / US | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Freigutpartners IP Law Firm Hahnrainweg 4 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/42] | Freigutpartners IP Law Firm Hahnrainweg 4 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 17879909.4 | 13.11.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017US61355 | Priority number, date | US201615376149 | 12.12.2016 Original published format: US201615376149 | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018111479 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3552066 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418, G05B23/02, F02C9/00, F01D21/00 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
G05B23/0254 (EP,US);
Y02E40/70 (US);
Y02E60/00 (US);
Y02P90/02 (US);
Y02P90/80 (EP,US);
Y04S10/50 (US);
Y04S40/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON PROBLEMEN BEI INDUSTRIELLEN PROZESSEN | [2019/42] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ISSUE DETECTION OF INDUSTRIAL PROCESSES | [2019/42] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE PROBLÈMES DE PROCESSUS INDUSTRIELS | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 26.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/49] | 04.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015178633 (ELBSAT MOHAMMAD N [US], et al) [X] 1-6,13 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0196]; figures 3-6 * [I] 7-12,14,15; | [Y]US2008086283 (YUAN CHAO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 21] , [0 23] , [0 30] , [0 33] * | [Y] - PETER D. HOFF ET AL, "A Covariance Regression Model", STATISTICA SINICA, (20120401), vol. 22, no. 2, doi:10.5705/ss.2010.051, ISSN 1017-0405, XP055510554 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5705/ss.2010.051 | International search | [Y]US2008086283 (YUAN CHAO [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0033], [0052], [0074]; and claims 1, 6, 15. *; | [Y]WO2015121176 (GE AVIAT SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [Y] 10 * See page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 7. *; | [A]US2012084042 (YUAN CHAO [US]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0008]-[0016]. *; | [A]WO2007064860 (SIEMENS CORP RES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0046]-[0056]; and figure 3. * | [Y] - PETER D. HOFF et al., "A covariance regression model", arXiv:1102.5721vl [stat.ME, (20110228), URL: https://arxiv.org/abs/1102.5721v1, XP055510554 [Y] 1-20 * See abstract, page 3, lines 21-24; and page 28, lines 20-22. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5705/ss.2010.051 |