EP3555388 - SUPPORT MODULE FOR A STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InQuik IP Holdings Pty Ltd Level 1 81 Henry Street Penrith NSW 2750 / AU | [2024/08] |
Former [2019/43] | For all designated states Lifting Point Pre-Form Pty Limited 81 Henry Street Penrith, New South Wales 2750 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULLANEY, Nicholas Bruce 672 Tiyces Lane Marulan, New South Wales 2579 / AU | 02 /
HOWELL, James Richard 145 Fotheringay Road Clarence Town, New South Wales 2321 / AU | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17880158.5 | 14.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017AU51387 | Priority number, date | AU20160905163 | 14.12.2016 Original published format: AU 2016905163 | [2019/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018107230 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3555388 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04G11/36, E04G17/14, E02D27/01 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
E04C5/0604 (EP,US);
E02D19/02 (EP);
E02D27/013 (EP);
E04C5/166 (EP,US);
E04C5/168 (EP,US);
E04G17/06 (EP);
E04G17/064 (EP);
E04G17/14 (US);
E04C5/20 (US);
E04G11/12 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | E04G11/36, E04G17/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | STÜTZMODUL FÜR EINE STRUKTUR | [2019/43] | English: | SUPPORT MODULE FOR A STRUCTURE | [2019/43] | French: | MODULE DE SUPPORT POUR UNE STRUCTURE | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 12.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 07.06.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 16.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH1136587 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,7,13,15 * abstract *[I] 14; | [X]FR2879634 (SIX FRANCOIS [FR]) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 7, line 21; figures 1-4 *; | [XI]US2007068105 (GIVEN WILLIAM A [US]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-6 * [I] 8; | [XI]US2012167503 (SUZUKI GOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,6,7,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0293]; figures 1-28; claim 19 * [I] 5,9,10,12 | International search | [X]WO2004113645 (BILOWOL PETER [AU]) [X] 1-13, 21-22 * figures 2a, 9 & 31; items VT, VH, 1, 22, 23, 24 & 25 *; | [X]US2016281355 (MCDONAGH GREGORY M [US]) [X] 1-13, 21-22 * figure 1, 4, 6, 7, 10; items 14, 20, 30, 80, 90 150,162, 170, 172 194; paragraphs [0085-0110] *; | [X]WO2016183639 (LIFTING POINT PRE-FORM PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1-12, 21-22* figures 31A & 33A; items 44, 46, 77; page 34 * | by applicant | JPH1136587 | FR2879634 | US2007068105 | US2012167503 |