EP3555284 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS USING CAS9 WITH ENHANCED SPACER ACQUISITION FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Rockefeller University 1230 York Avenue New York, NY 10021 / US | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARRAFFINI, Luciano 501 Hicks Street 201 Brooklyn, NY 11231 / US | 02 /
HELLER, Robert 1230 York Avenue Box 120 New York, NY 10065 / US | 03 /
BIKARD, David 10 Rue Joseph Liouville 75015 Paris / FR | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2019/43] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 17880660.0 | 18.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017US66937 | Priority number, date | US201662435406P | 16.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662435406 P | [2019/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018112451 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3555284 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3555284 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12N15/74, C12P21/06, C12C11/00, C12G1/00, C07H21/04 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
A23C9/123 (US);
C12C11/00 (EP);
C12G1/00 (EP,US);
C12N15/74 (US);
C12N2310/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON CAS9 MIT VERBESSERTER ABSTANDSERFASSUNGSFUNKTION | [2019/43] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS USING CAS9 WITH ENHANCED SPACER ACQUISITION FUNCTION | [2019/43] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS UTILISANT CAS9 AVEC UNE FONCTION D'ACQUISITION D'ESPACEUR AMÉLIORÉE | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 14.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2017 | AL | 01.12.2021 | AT | 01.12.2021 | CY | 01.12.2021 | CZ | 01.12.2021 | DK | 01.12.2021 | EE | 01.12.2021 | ES | 01.12.2021 | FI | 01.12.2021 | HR | 01.12.2021 | IT | 01.12.2021 | LT | 01.12.2021 | LV | 01.12.2021 | MC | 01.12.2021 | MK | 01.12.2021 | MT | 01.12.2021 | NL | 01.12.2021 | PL | 01.12.2021 | RO | 01.12.2021 | RS | 01.12.2021 | SE | 01.12.2021 | SI | 01.12.2021 | SK | 01.12.2021 | SM | 01.12.2021 | IE | 18.12.2021 | LU | 18.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | BG | 01.03.2022 | NO | 01.03.2022 | GR | 02.03.2022 | IS | 01.04.2022 | PT | 01.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 18.12.2017 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
MK | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 18.12.2017 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 18.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 18.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 01.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2018149888 (UNIV DEGLI STUDI DI TRENTO [IT]) [E] 1-5 * page 4, lines 15, 26 ** claims 4, 6, 8, 10 *; | [AD] - YUNZHOU WEI ET AL, "Cas9 function and host genome sampling in Type II-A CRISPR-Cas adaptation", GENES AND DEVELOPMENT., US, (20150215), vol. 29, no. 4, doi:10.1101/gad.257550.114, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 356 - 361, XP055703542 [AD] 1-15 * page 358, column l, paragraph 2 - page 360, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.257550.114 | [AD] - ROBERT HELER ET AL, "Cas9 specifies functional viral targets during CRISPR-Cas adaptation", NATURE, London, (20150301), vol. 519, no. 7542, doi:10.1038/nature14245, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 199 - 202, XP055703544 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature14245 | [AD] - CAROLIN ANDERS ET AL, "Structural basis of PAM-dependent target DNA recognition by the Cas9 endonuclease", NATURE, London, (20140101), vol. 513, no. 7519, doi:10.1038/nature13579, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 569 - 573, XP055240929 [AD] 1-15 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature13579 | [AD] - M. JINEK ET AL, "Structures of Cas9 Endonucleases Reveal RNA-Mediated Conformational Activation", SCIENCE, (20140314), vol. 343, no. 6176, doi:10.1126/science.1247997, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1247997 - 1247997, XP055149157 [AD] 1-15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1247997 | International search | [Y]US2016319261 (JOUNG J KEITH [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * , para [0003]-[0007], [0009], [0010], [0023], [0025], [0028], [0034], [0059], [0062], [0089], [0129], [0132], [0166], and SEQ ID NO: 1 *; | [Y] - NISHIMASU et al., "Crystal structure of Cas9 in complex with guide RNA and target DNA", Cell, (20140227), vol. 156, no. 5, pages 935 - 949, XP055423859 [Y] 1-7 * . Abstract; pg 936, Fig 1; pg 937, col 1, last para , and col 2, para 2 and last para; pg 938, col 1, col 2, up para, and Fig 2B; and pg 943, col 2, para 1, and Fig 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2014.02.001 | [Y] - STEFFENS et al., "Efficient Site-Directed Saturation Mutagenesis Using Degenerate Oligonucleotides", J Biomol Tech, (20070701), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 147 - 9, XP055494185 [Y] 1-7 * . Abstract; and pg 147, col 1, para 1, and col 2, up para * | [A] - ESVELT et al., "Orthogonal Cas9 proteins for RNA-guided gene regulation and editing", Nat Methods, vol. 10, no. 11, (20130929), pages 1116 - 21, URL: doi:10.1038/nmeth.2681, XP055128928 [A] 1-7 * . PDF File: pg 1-19. Entire documentation, especially pg 2, para 3, and last para; pg 17, Fig 5; and pg 19, Table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.2681 | [A] - LIA-BALDINI et al., "A molecular approach to dominance in hypophosphatasia", Hum Genet, vol. 109, no. 1, (20010703), pages 99 - 108, URL: DOI10.1007/s004390100546, XP055494188 [A] 1-7 * . Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004390100546 | [A] - ZHANG et al., "Comparison of non-canonical PAMs for CRISPR/Cas9-mediated DNA cleavage in human cells", Sci Kep, vol. 4, (20140423), URL: https://doi.org/10.1038/srep05405, XP055494195 [A] 1-7 * . PDF File: pg 1-5. Entire documentation especially Abstract; and pg 1, para 1 and para 2 * | [PX] - HELER et al., "Mutations in Cas9 enhance the rate of acquisition of viral spacer sequences during the CRISPR-Cas immune response", Mol Cell, vol. 65, no. 1, (20170105), pages 168 - 175, URL: doi:10.1016/j.molcel.2016.11.031, XP029876898 [PX] 1-7 * . Epub 201G Dec 22. PDF File: pg 1-17. Entire documentation, especially Abstract; pg 2, last para; pg 3; pg 4, up para; pg 7, up para; pg 9, para 3; pg 13, Fig 1; and pg 16, Fig 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2016.11.031 |