EP3556229 - ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Changzhou Patent Electronic Technology Co., Ltd Room 512 Buiding No.2 Fuchen Garden Xinbei District Changzhou Jiangsu 213022 / CN | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIU, Weihua No.7 Fengxiang Road Xinbei District Changzhou Jiangsu 213125 / CN | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Zaboliene, Reda Metida Business center Vertas Gyneju str. 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/43] | Zaboliene, Reda METIDA Law Firm Zaboliene and Partners Business center VERTAS Gyneju 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | Application number, filing date | 17880700.4 | 15.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017CN116650 | Priority number, date | CN201611163578 | 15.12.2016 Original published format: CN201611163578 | [2019/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018108172 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3556229 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, A24F40/50 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
A24F40/50 (EP,US);
A24F40/48 (EP,CN,US);
A24F40/53 (EP,CN,US);
A24F40/10 (EP,CN,US);
A61M11/042 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTE UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/43] | English: | ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR | [2019/43] | French: | CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE CORRESPONDANT | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2019 | Translation filed | 17.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 13.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008029107 (RUFF BRUCE ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-9 *; | [A]CN104770876 (CHINA TOBACCO YUNNAN IND CO LTD) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0065]; figures 1-6 * |