EP3554675 - PURIFICATION PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF ULTRA HIGH PURITY CARBON MONOXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde GmbH Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2020/25] |
Former [2019/43] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Klosterhofstr. 1 80331 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILNER, David 2 Poplar Road Long Valley, NJ 07853 / US | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Andreas, et al RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 33 02 11 80062 München / DE | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17881178.2 | 08.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017US65327 | Priority number, date | US201662433274P | 13.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662433274 P | [2019/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018111719 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3554675 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C25B15/08, C25B1/00, B01D53/00, F25J3/06, F25J3/08 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
B01D53/002 (EP);
F25J3/0261 (US);
C01B32/40 (US);
C25B1/00 (EP,US);
C25B15/08 (EP,US);
F25J3/0223 (US);
F25J3/0252 (US);
F25J3/0266 (US);
F25J3/0655 (EP);
F25J3/0665 (EP);
F25J3/08 (EP);
B01D2256/16 (EP);
B01D2256/20 (EP);
B01D2257/504 (EP);
F25J2200/70 (US);
F25J2205/04 (US);
F25J2205/20 (EP,US);
F25J2205/24 (EP);
F25J2210/18 (US);
F25J2210/42 (EP);
F25J2215/04 (EP);
F25J2215/14 (EP);
F25J2220/40 (US);
F25J2220/42 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | B01D53/86, C25B15/08, C25B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHREINEM KOHLENMONOXID | [2019/43] | English: | PURIFICATION PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF ULTRA HIGH PURITY CARBON MONOXIDE | [2019/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION POUR LA PRODUCTION DE MONOXYDE DE CARBONE ULTRA PUR | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 12.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3513660 (BECKER RUDOLF) [A] 1-8 * column 4, lines 1-73; figure . *; | [XI]JPS63163771 (DAIDO OXYGEN) [X] 5,7 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1, 2 * [I] 1-8; | [A]US2011302955 (LOCKWOOD FREDERICK [FR], et al) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0147] - [0151]; figures 11, 12 * | International search | [X]US4566886 (FABIAN RAINER [DE], et al) [X] 1-8 * ; Fig. 3, 4; col 3 In 30-38, 60-63; col 4 In 53-58 *; | [A]US3501921 (MUENGER JAMES R, et al) [A] 1-8 * ; entire document *; | [A]US4473110 (ZAWIERUCHA ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-8 * ; entire document *; | [A]EP3031956 (HALDOR TOPSØE AS [DK]) [A] 1-8 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2010055021 (TEIXEIRA GUILLAUME [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * ; entire document *; | [A]US6192706 (BERGMAN JR THOMAS JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * ; entire document *; | [A]US4110359 (MARION CHARLES P) [A] 1-8 * : entire document * |