EP3556608 - VEHICLE LIGHTING SYSTEM, VEHICLE SYSTEM, VEHICLE, AND DATA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 8-3 Takanawa 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8711 / JP | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TATARA Naoki c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING Co. Ltd. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | 02 /
MASUDA Takeshi c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING Co. Ltd. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | 03 /
OKAMURA Toshihiro c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING Co. Ltd. Shizuoka Plant 500 Kitawaki Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17881222.8 | 11.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017JP44357 | Priority number, date | JP20160241090 | 13.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016241090 | JP20160241556 | 13.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016241556 | [2019/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018110495 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3556608 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/50, B60Q1/54 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
B60Q1/54 (EP,US);
B60Q1/507 (EP,US);
B60Q1/547 (EP,US);
G05D1/0223 (US);
G05D1/0276 (US);
B60Q1/38 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGBELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM, FAHRZEUGSYSTEM, FAHRZEUG UND DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2019/43] | English: | VEHICLE LIGHTING SYSTEM, VEHICLE SYSTEM, VEHICLE, AND DATA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2019/43] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE DE VÉHICULE, SYSTÈME DE VÉHICULE, VÉHICULE ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2019 | Translation filed | 11.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 16.10.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006036920 (BEKHOR SOLOMON [US]) [A] 1-11* figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2015194053 (JENSEN PAUL W [US]) [A] 6,7 * paragraphs [0029] - [0038]; claims 8, 9 *; | [XI]US2015336502 (HILLIS W DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-11 * paragraphs [0028] - [0071]; figures 1-11 * [I] 6,7; | [X]EP2993083 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [X] 1-5,8-11 * paragraphs [0092] - [0186]; figures 1-10 *; | [XI]GB2531084 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,8-11 * the whole document * [I] 6,7; | [XI]DE102014226188 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,10,11 * paragraphs [0020] - [0079]; figures 1-4 * [I] 6-9; | [XP]WO2017056995 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [XP] 1-6,10,11 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2013131065 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 12-16, 18* , [0009] - L00591, 1-10 *; | [A]JP2015071340 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]JP2015162005 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-18 * , *; | [A]JP2016124502 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1-18 * , *; | [A]JP2016166013 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-18 * , * | by applicant | JPH09277887 | JP20160241090 | JP20160241556 |