EP3556964 - CERAMIC TILE LEVELING BRACKET, PUSHING AND CLAMPING PLIERS AND CERAMIC TILE LEVELING AND LAYING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Great Star Industrial Co., Ltd. No. 35 Jiuhuan Road Jianggan District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310019 / CN | For all designated states Haining Sheffield Knives Co., Ltd. Building 2 No.11 Qihui Road Agricultural Development District Chang'an Town Haining, Zhejiang 314423 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2019/43] | For all designated states Hangzhou Great Star Industrial Co., Ltd. No.35 Jiuhuan Road Jianggan District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310019 / CN | ||
For all designated states Haining Sheffield Knives Co., Ltd. Building 2 No.11 Qihui Road Agricultural Development District Chang'an Town Haining, Zhejiang 314423 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yueming No. 35 Jiuhuan Road Jianggan District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310019 / CN | [2023/47] |
Former [2019/43] | 01 /
LI, Yueming No.35 Jiuhuan Road Jianggan District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310019 / CN | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17881272.3 | 07.08.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017CN96189 | Priority number, date | CN201621388937U | 18.12.2016 Original published format: CN 201621388937 U | [2019/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018107773 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3556964 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04F21/22, E04F21/18, B25B7/14, B25B7/22, E04F13/08, E04F15/02, E04F21/00 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
E04F21/0092 (EP);
E04F21/1877 (EP,US);
B25B27/02 (EP);
B25B7/02 (EP);
B25B7/08 (EP);
B25B7/14 (EP);
B25B7/22 (US);
E04F13/0892 (EP);
E04F15/02022 (EP);
E04F21/22 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | E04F21/22, E04F21/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | KLAMMER FÜR KERAMIKFLIESENNIVELLIERUNG, SCHIEBE- UND SPANNZANGE UND KERAMIKFLIESENNIVELLIERUNGS- UND VERLEGESYSTEM | [2019/43] | English: | CERAMIC TILE LEVELING BRACKET, PUSHING AND CLAMPING PLIERS AND CERAMIC TILE LEVELING AND LAYING SYSTEM | [2019/43] | French: | SUPPORT DE MISE À NIVEAU DE CARREAU DE CÉRAMIQUE, PINCE DE POUSSÉE ET DE SERRAGE, ET SYSTÈME DE MISE À NIVEAU ET DE POSE DE CARREAU DE CÉRAMIQUE | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2019 | Translation filed | 17.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4149435 (SMITH GORDON E); | [XI]US5022292 (HAMMER RUSSELL C [US], et al); | [X]US2009211034 (LIONEL MICHAEL ALAN PHILIP [US]); | [X]EP2514886 (S I R I S R L [IT]); | [X]CN203769274U (WENZHOU SAIGE PLASTIC CO LTD); | [X]CN203856178U (GUANGZHOU LUBAN BUILDING ENGINEERING TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [XI]WO2015161366 (BIEC EDMUND [CA]); | [I]CN204983579U (YUYAO DONGHUA ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE PLASTICS FACTORY); | [XI]CN205713011U (YUEQING DINGYI PLASTIC IND CO LTD) | International search | [A]WO2008118418 (Q E P CO INC [US], et al); | [X]CN203769274U (WENZHOU SAIGE PLASTIC CO LTD); | [X]CN203856178U (GUANGZHOU LUBAN BUILDING ENGINEERING TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN204456801U (YUEQING DINGYI PLASTIC INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [X]WO2015161366 (BIEC EDMUND [CA]); | [A]CN204983579U (YUYAO DONGHUA ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE PLASTICS FACTORY); | [A]CN205713011U (YUEQING DINGYI PLASTIC IND CO LTD) |