EP3530261 - FLUORESCENT MATERIAL FOR COSMETICS, AND COSMETIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sakai Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. 5-2, Ebisujima-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8502 / JP | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKO, Emi c/o SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY Co. Ltd. 5-1 Ebisujima-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0985 / JP | 02 /
EZOE, Ryota c/o SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY Co. Ltd. 5-1 Ebisujima-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0985 / JP | 03 /
OGATA, Nanae c/o SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY Co. Ltd. 5-1 Ebisujima-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0985 / JP | 04 /
MORI, Kenji c/o SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY Co. Ltd. 5-1 Ebisujima-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 590-0985 / JP | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2023/26] |
Former [2019/35] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17882300.1 | 19.12.2017 | [2019/35] | WO2017JP45586 | Priority number, date | JP20160246607 | 20.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016246607 | [2019/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018117117 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3530261 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3530261 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/24, A61Q1/00, A61Q1/02, A61Q17/04, C01B25/32, C09K11/71 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
A61Q1/12 (EP);
A61K8/19 (EP,KR);
A61K8/24 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/0241 (EP);
A61Q1/00 (KR);
A61Q1/02 (US);
A61Q17/04 (KR);
C01B25/32 (EP);
C09K11/771 (KR);
C09K11/7724 (EP);
A61K2800/412 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2800/434 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORESZIERENDES MATERIAL FÜR KOSMETIKA UND KOSMETIKUM | [2019/35] | English: | FLUORESCENT MATERIAL FOR COSMETICS, AND COSMETIC | [2019/35] | French: | MATÉRIAU FLUORESCENT POUR PRODUITS COSMÉTIQUES, ET PRODUIT COSMÉTIQUE | [2019/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2019 | Translation filed | 20.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 31.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2023 | CZ | 28.06.2023 | DK | 28.06.2023 | EE | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | FI | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | LT | 28.06.2023 | LV | 28.06.2023 | MC | 28.06.2023 | NL | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SE | 28.06.2023 | SI | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | PT | 30.10.2023 | LU | 19.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SI | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH03284613 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) [Y] 1-3 * Summary of the invention;; example 16 *; | [XD]JP2015054950 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP, et al) [XD] 1-3 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050]; table 3 *; | [YD]JP2016141780 (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO) [YD] 1-3* the whole document *; | [E]WO2019106920 (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO [JP]) [E] 1-3 * Synthesis Example 1 * | International search | JPH05117127 [y] (SHISEIDO CO LTD, et al) [y] 1-3; | JP2015054950 [y] (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP, et al) [y] 2-3; | WO2016063847 [y] (ROHTO PHARMA [JP], et al) [y] 1-3; | JP2016141781 [y] (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO) [y] 1-3; | [yY] - Zhao, Xin, "High efficient blue emission of Ce3+ activated Ca4P2O9 phosphor for white LEDs", (20131213), vol. 21, no. 25, doi:10.1364/OE.21.031660, pages 31660 - 31667, XP055593488 [y] 1-3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.21.031660 | [aA] - Ono,Kazuhisa, "Development on light emitting poweder and application to cosmetics (non-official translation)", Flagrance Journal, (19940200), pages 11 - 16, XP009515110 [a] 1-3 | by applicant | JP2005206613 | JP2015054950 | JP2016141781 | JP2016141780 | - "Single-phased white-light-emitting Ca (PO ) 0:Ce Eu phosphors based on energy transfer", Dalton Trans., (20150000), vol. 44, pages 11399 - 11407 | - "High efficient blue emission of Ce3+ activated Ca P 0 phosphor for white LEDs", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20131216), vol. 21, no. 25, pages 31660 - 31667 |