EP3559202 - SENSOR INTERFACE FOR SINGLE-USE CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosemount Inc. 8200 Market Boulevard Chanhassen, MN 55317 / US | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FADELL, Paul 20107 Fairfield Trace Drive Cypress, Texas 77433 / US | 02 /
PRICE, Joshua 803 East Tom Green Street Brenham, Texas 77833 / US | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17882349.8 | 08.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017US65254 | Priority number, date | US201615390154 | 23.12.2016 Original published format: US201615390154 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018118458 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3559202 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/34 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
C12M41/40 (EP,US);
G01D11/00 (CN);
C12M23/28 (EP,US);
C12M23/46 (EP,US);
G01L19/00 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | SENSORSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR EINWEGBEHÄLTER | [2019/44] | English: | SENSOR INTERFACE FOR SINGLE-USE CONTAINERS | [2019/44] | French: | INTERFACE DE CAPTEUR POUR RÉCIPIENTS À USAGE UNIQUE | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 22.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005225035 (SUNDET PAUL C [US]) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0020] * * Figures *; | [I]WO2013180853 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US]) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0011] ** Figures *; | [I]CN205620076U (ROSEMOUNT INC) [I] 1-13 * the whole document * * Figures *; | [XP]WO2017003759 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US]) [XP] * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0019] * * Figures * | International search | [Y]US2007151349 (SCHUMACHER MARK [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * See abstract; paragraph [0017]: claim 1; and figure 3A. *; | [A]US7258017 (HEDTKE ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-13 * See abstract; columns 2-3; claim 1; and figure 1A. *; | [Y]US2008053255 (FUREY JAMES F [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * See paragraphs [0004]-[0037]; and figures 1, 6. *; | [A]WO2014052140 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * See abstract; claims 1-3; and figures 1-2B. *; | [A]WO2014121756 (WIKA ALEXANDER WIEGAND SE & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * See abstract; claims 1-3; and figure 1. *; | [PX]WO2017003759 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US]) [PX] 1-6* See abstract; paragraphs [0020]-[0029]; claims 1-14; and figures 1-4. * |