EP3560636 - METAL MICROPARTICLES, AND DISPERSION LIQUID CONTAINING METAL MICROPARTICLES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd. 18-1 Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8627 / JP | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKO, Akira c/o Tokan Material Technology Co. Ltd. 1-27 Oyodokita 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-8526 / JP | 02 /
SHIMOMURA, Hiroshi c/o Tokan Material Technology Co. Ltd. 1-27 Oyodokita 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-8526 / JP | 03 /
OHASHI, Kazuaki c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings Ltd. Corporate Research&Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | 04 /
KOSAKA, Yasuhiro c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings Ltd. Corporate Research&Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | 05 /
KOGANEI, Akiko c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings Ltd. Corporate Research&Development 22-4 Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/11] |
Former [2019/44] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17883428.9 | 15.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017JP45102 | Priority number, date | JP20160246577 | 20.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016246577 | [2019/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018116980 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560636 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3560636 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/00, B22F9/24, // C22C1/04, C22C5/06 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
B22F9/24 (EP,KR,US);
A01N25/04 (EP,KR);
A01N59/16 (EP,KR);
A01N59/20 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/054 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/0545 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/056 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/102 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/108 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
B82Y40/00 (EP);
B22F2301/10 (US);
B22F2301/255 (US);
B22F2301/30 (US);
C22C1/0425 (EP);
C22C1/0466 (EP);
C22C1/0483 (EP);
C22C5/06 (EP);
C22C9/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/18] | B22F1/00, B22F1/02, B22F9/24, A01N25/04, A01N59/16, A01N59/20, B82Y30/00, B82Y40/00 | ||
Former IPC [2019/44] | B22F9/00, A01N25/04, A01N59/16, A01P3/00, B22F1/02, B22F9/24, B82Y30/00, B82Y40/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLMIKROPARTIKEL UND METALLMIKROPARTIKEL ENTHALTENDE DISPERSIONSFLÜSSIGKEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2021/46] | English: | METAL MICROPARTICLES, AND DISPERSION LIQUID CONTAINING METAL MICROPARTICLES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2019/44] | French: | MICROPARTICULES MÉTALLIQUES ET LIQUIDE DE DISPERSION CONTENANT DES MICROPARTICULES MÉTALLIQUES ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2019/44] |
Former [2019/44] | METALLMIKROPARTIKEL UND DISPERSIONSFLÜSSIGKEITSHALTIGE METALLMIKROPARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2019 | Translation filed | 04.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 16.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2017 | AL | 16.03.2022 | AT | 16.03.2022 | CY | 16.03.2022 | CZ | 16.03.2022 | DK | 16.03.2022 | EE | 16.03.2022 | ES | 16.03.2022 | FI | 16.03.2022 | HR | 16.03.2022 | IT | 16.03.2022 | LT | 16.03.2022 | LV | 16.03.2022 | MC | 16.03.2022 | MK | 16.03.2022 | NL | 16.03.2022 | PL | 16.03.2022 | RO | 16.03.2022 | RS | 16.03.2022 | SE | 16.03.2022 | SI | 16.03.2022 | SK | 16.03.2022 | SM | 16.03.2022 | BG | 16.06.2022 | NO | 16.06.2022 | GR | 17.06.2022 | IS | 16.07.2022 | PT | 18.07.2022 | IE | 15.12.2022 | LU | 15.12.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 15.12.2017 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MK | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 15.12.2017 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 15.12.2017 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 16.03.2022 | |
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 16.03.2022 | |
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.03.2022 | |
NO | 16.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2011155432 (TOMONARI MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0084] , [0 85] * * table 2 * * examples 11, 13-15 * [Y] 1-11; | [Y]US2016255841 (OHASHI KAZUAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11* paragraph [0078]; example 1 *; | [Y]EP3072931 (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0080]; example 1 * | International search | JPH1180647 [xya] (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [x] 1,3,4,6 [y] 1-4,6,7,10,11 [a] 5,8,9; | JP2010202943 [ya] (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD) [y] 1-4,6,7,10,11 [a] 5,8,9; | WO2011024969 [a] (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al)[a] 1-11; | JP2012511627 [a] [a] 1-11 * the whole document *; | WO2015064700 [ya] (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [y] 1-4,6,7,10,11 [a] 5,8,9 | Examination | JP2009227736 | TW201402252 | JP5502434B | by applicant | JPH08311373 | JP2008508321 | WO2011007650 | JP2013241643 | JP2015086435 |