EP3557527 - OBJECT DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2021/40] |
Former [2019/43] | For all designated states Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOMEZCABALLERO Felipe c/o HITACHI Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
TAKEMURA Masayuki c/o HITACHI Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
NONAKA Shinichi c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2019/43] | Application number, filing date | 17883461.0 | 07.12.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017JP43937 | Priority number, date | JP20160245529 | 19.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016245529 | [2019/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018116841 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3557527 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3557527 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/58, G06V20/56, G01C3/06, G06T1/00, H04N7/18, H04N13/00, G06T7/12, G06T7/593, G06T7/73, G08G1/16 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G06T7/593 (EP,US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G01C3/06 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (EP,US);
G06T7/00 (US);
G06T7/12 (EP);
G06T7/60 (US);
G06T7/73 (EP);
G06V20/58 (EP,US);
G06V20/588 (EP,US);
G08G1/16 (EP,US);
H04N7/18 (EP);
H04N7/183 (EP);
G06T2200/04 (EP);
G06T2207/10012 (US);
G06T2207/20228 (US);
G06T2207/30252 (EP);
G06T2207/30256 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/34] | G06T7/00, G06T7/593, G08G1/16, G06K9/00, H04N13/271, G06T7/12, G06T7/73 | ||
Former IPC [2019/43] | G06T7/00, G06T7/593, G08G1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBJEKTERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/43] | English: | OBJECT DETECTION DEVICE | [2019/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'OBJET | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2019 | Translation filed | 02.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 20.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2040196 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [XA]US2015165972 (TAKEMAE YOSHINAO [JP], et al); | International search | [A]JPH11213138 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JP2013140515 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV); | [A]WO2015163028 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) | Examination | JP2012225806 | by applicant | JP2009146217 | JP2015179302 |