EP3561099 - COLD-ROLLED STEEL SHEET HAVING EXCELLENT CORROSION RESISTANCE AND FORMABILITY, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Posco (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JO, Min-Ho c/o Pohang Iron & Steel Works 6262 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37877 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jong-Hwa c/o Pohang Iron & Steel Works 6262 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37877 / KR | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 17883774.6 | 11.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017KR14438 | Priority number, date | KR20160177186 | 22.12.2016 Original published format: KR 20160177186 | [2019/44] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018117508 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3561099 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/12, C22C38/60, C22C38/22, C21D8/02, C21D9/46 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
C21D9/46 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/004 (EP,KR);
C22C38/60 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/012 (EP,US);
C21D1/02 (EP);
C21D8/02 (KR);
C21D8/0226 (EP,US);
C21D8/0236 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0263 (EP);
C21D8/0273 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (KR,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (KR,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/26 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | KALTGEWALZTES STAHLBLECH MIT HERVORRAGENDER KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGKEIT UND FORMBARKEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/44] | English: | COLD-ROLLED STEEL SHEET HAVING EXCELLENT CORROSION RESISTANCE AND FORMABILITY, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2019/44] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER LAMINÉE À FROID PRÉSENTANT UNE EXCELLENTE RÉSISTANCE À LA CORROSION ET UNE TRÈS BONNE APTITUDE AU FAÇONNAGE, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2019 | Translation filed | 17.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 18.05.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05230595 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]EP0559225 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0659888 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2001001049 (HIGO YUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * claims 1-4 * * claim 9 * * paragraph [[0008]] * * paragraph [[0053]] *; | [A]WO2006118423 (POSCO [KR], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH05230595 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 1-9 * See paragraphs [0070], [0071] and claims 1, 5. *; | [X]KR19990074795 (NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD.) [X] 1-9 * See claims 1-3, 9-11. *; | [A]JP2009030147 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-9 * See paragraphs [0093], [0094] and claims 2-6. *; | [A]JP2012132093 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-9* See paragraphs [0020], [0022] and claims 4, 5. *; | [A]KR20140041290 (HYUNDAI STEEL CO [KR]) [A] 1-9 * See paragraphs [0123]-[0126] and claims 1-4. * | by applicant | KR100694697B | KR100833050B | KR101197955B | KR101485643B | KR20150140423 |