EP3558779 - VEHICLE CONTROLS BASED ON THE MEASURED WEIGHT OF FREIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aurora Operations, Inc. 1654 Smallman Street Pittsburgh, PA 15222 / US | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/16] | For all designated states UATC, LLC 1654 Smallman Street Pittsburgh, PA 15222 / US | ||
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states UATC, LLC 280 North Bernardo Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states Uber Technologies, Inc. 1455 Market Street, 4th Floor San Francisco, California 94103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNETTE, Donald 1455 Market St. 4th Floor San Francisco, California 94103 / US | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [2024/36] |
Former [2019/44] | Grant, David Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 17884074.0 | 14.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017US66447 | Priority number, date | US201615385613 | 20.12.2016 Original published format: US201615385613 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018118649 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3558779 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3558779 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/20, B60W40/076, B60W40/105, B60W60/00, B60W50/04, B60W50/14, B60W10/06, B60W10/184, B60W40/13, G01G19/02, G05D1/00, B60W50/00, B60W40/107 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
B60W40/13 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/184 (EP,US);
B60W10/20 (EP);
B60W40/076 (EP);
B60W40/105 (EP);
B60W40/107 (EP);
B60W50/14 (EP);
B60W60/00186 (EP);
B60W60/0053 (EP);
G01G19/02 (US);
G01G19/022 (EP,US);
G01G23/36 (US);
G05D1/0061 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0031 (EP);
B60W2050/0033 (EP);
B60W2050/0035 (EP);
B60W2050/0039 (EP);
B60W2050/0072 (EP,US);
B60W2050/046 (EP);
B60W2050/143 (EP);
B60W2050/146 (EP);
B60W2300/12 (EP);
B60W2300/125 (EP);
B60W2510/0604 (EP);
B60W2510/182 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP,US);
B60W2520/105 (EP,US);
B60W2520/16 (EP,US);
B60W2530/16 (EP,US);
B60W2540/18 (EP);
B60W2552/15 (EP);
B60W2710/0605 (EP);
B60W2710/182 (EP);
B60W2710/207 (EP);
B60Y2300/18133 (EP);
B60Y2300/433 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | B60W40/13, G01G19/08, G08C17/02, G05D1/00, B60W10/06, B60W10/184, G01G19/02, B60W50/00 | ||
Former IPC [2019/44] | B60W40/13, G01G19/08, G08C17/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGEN AUF BASIS DES GEMESSENEN FRACHTGEWICHTS | [2019/44] | English: | VEHICLE CONTROLS BASED ON THE MEASURED WEIGHT OF FREIGHT | [2019/44] | French: | COMMANDES DE VÉHICULE BASÉES SUR UN POIDS DE FRET MESURÉ | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 25.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2013138288 (NICKOLAOU JAMES N [US], et al); | [Y]KR101308925B (KOREA ENVIRONMENT CORP [KR]); | [Y]US2015298697 (KELLY JAMES [GB], et al); | International search | [A]WO2009072965 (SCANIA CV AB PUBL [SE], et al); | [X]WO2010144028 (SCANIA CV AB [SE], et al); | [A]US2015203117 (KELLY JAMES [GB], et al) | by applicant | US2013138288 | KR101308925B | US2015298697 |