EP3558154 - DENTAL SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biolase, Inc. 4 Cromwell Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUTOUSSOV, Dmitri 23811 Sail Way Dana Point California 92629 / US | 02 /
PATTON, Doug 3050 Pullman Street Costa Mesa California 92629 / US | 03 /
JACKSON, Richard 27 Clementine St. Trabuco Canyon California 92679 / US | 04 /
SHATTUCK, Channing 33 Via Alta Vista Bonsall California 92003 / US | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | WBH Wachenhausen Patentanwälte PartG mbB Müllerstraße 40 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Wachenhausen & Kollegen Patentanwälte GbR Schellingstrasse 29 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17884350.4 | 21.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017US68009 | Priority number, date | US201662438741P | 23.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662438741 P | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018119302 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3558154 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/00, G16H30/40, G16H40/63, G16H40/67, G16H50/20 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
A61C1/0015 (EP,US);
A61C1/0046 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/04847 (US);
G16H30/40 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/44] | A61C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | DENTALSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2019/44] | English: | DENTAL SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2019/44] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DENTAIRE | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 01.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2020 | 31.12.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015268803 (PATTON DOUGLAS [US], et al) | International search | [A]WO2004016182 (ORTHOSOFT INC [CA]); | [A]US6847336 (LEMELSON JEROME H [US], et al); | [A]US7199790 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US], et al); | [A]US2009225060 (RIZOIU IOANA M [US], et al); | [X]US2015268803 (PATTON DOUGLAS [US], et al) | by applicant | US2015268803 |