EP3562262 - COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/40] |
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Wei ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Fan ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LIANG, Minchao ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
YU, Jinqing ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, He ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/40] |
Former [2019/44] | Aipex B.V. P.O. Box 30223 3001 DE Rotterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 17884615.0 | 21.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017CN117715 | Priority number, date | CN201611195848 | 21.12.2016 Original published format: CN201611195848 | [2019/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018113734 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3562262 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3562262 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/08, H04L25/00, H04L25/02, H04B1/00, H04W24/02, H04W28/02, H04W28/16, H04W52/02, H04W56/00 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
H04L25/02 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP,CN);
G06F9/5011 (US);
G06F1/10 (US);
H04B1/0003 (EP);
H04W28/02 (EP);
H04W28/0236 (CN);
H04W28/16 (EP,CN);
H04W52/02 (EP);
H04W52/0261 (CN);
H04W56/00 (EP);
H04W56/001 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2020/35] | H04W88/08, H04L25/00, H04L25/02, H04B1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2019/44] | H04W88/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND BASISSTATION | [2019/44] | English: | COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND BASE STATION | [2019/44] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION ET STATION DE BASE | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2019 | Translation filed | 19.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 22.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23194260.8 / EP4287726 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | MC | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SK | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 05.01.2024 | |
IS | 04.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2472995 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1, 2 *; | [I]WO2016197991 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [I] 1-13* the whole document * |