EP3551548 - DEVICES FOR MONITORING FOOD FRESHNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/42] | DEVICES FOR MONITORING FOOD FRESHNESS AND METHODS OF USING SAME | ||
[2024/28] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Granevitze, Zur Menachem Begin 18B Mazkeret Batya 7683965 / IL | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGNES, Ben-Zion 15 Meitar Street 8502500 Meitar / IL | 02 /
GRANEVITZE, Zur Menachem Begin 18B Mazkeret Batya 7683965 / IL | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander, et al 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bajuwarenring 14 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/42] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17884792.7 | 17.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017IL51355 | Priority number, date | US201662435864P | 19.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662435864 P | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018116294 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3551548 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/80, G01N31/22, C12Q1/04, // G01N33/04, B65D85/80, B65D79/02 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
C12Q1/04 (EP,IL);
G01N21/78 (IL);
B65D25/54 (US);
B65D79/02 (EP,IL);
B65D85/80 (EP,IL,US);
G01N21/80 (EP,IL,US);
G01N31/221 (EP);
G01N33/04 (EP,IL,US);
B65D2203/12 (US);
G01N33/12 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/42] | B65D79/02, B65D85/80, G01N33/02, G01N33/50, G01N21/78 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER LEBENSMITTELFRISCHE | [2024/28] | English: | DEVICES FOR MONITORING FOOD FRESHNESS | [2024/28] | French: | DISPOSITIFS POUR SURVEILLER LA FRAÎCHEUR DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | [2024/28] |
Former [2019/42] | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER LEBENSMITTELFRISCHE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2019/42] | DEVICES FOR MONITORING FOOD FRESHNESS AND METHODS OF USING SAME | ||
Former [2019/42] | DISPOSITIFS POUR SURVEILLER LA FRAÎCHEUR DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 05.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002151075 (CHEN NATALI [IL], et al); | [XI]US6495368 (WALLACH DONALD F H [US]); | [XI]US2008176273 (EDEN GIDEON [US], et al) | International search | [A]US6723285 (CHEN NATALI [IL], et al) [A] 1-39 * Abstract *; | [A]DE102004019427 (KARDA PROJEKTENTWICKLUNG UND B [DE]) [A] 1-39 * Abstract *; | [A]US2006057022 (WILLIAMS JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-39* Abstract *; | [X]US2010215878 (HURME EERO [FI], et al) [X] 39 * paragraphs [0012] and [0024] *; | [A]WO2014102556 (IDEAPOOL KFT [HU]) [A] 1-39 * Abstract * |