EP3562193 - RADIO LINK MANAGEMENT METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Li ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 17884894.1 | 25.10.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017CN107714 | Priority number, date | CN201611187516 | 20.12.2016 Original published format: CN201611187516 | [2019/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018113410 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3562193 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/32, H04L12/24, H04L12/26 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
H04L41/0816 (EP);
H04W28/0215 (CN);
H04W28/0861 (EP,CN,US);
H04L41/0836 (EP);
H04L43/0811 (EP);
H04W16/32 (EP);
H04W28/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/44] | H04W16/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Title | German: | FUNKVERBINDUNGSVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM SOWIE SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2019/44] | English: | RADIO LINK MANAGEMENT METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2019/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL, ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE LIAISON RADIO, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2019 | Translation filed | 19.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 12.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN104640165 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2015184889 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2016047904 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0287] * * claims 1-12 * * figures 1-16 *; | [XI]US2016135103 (LEE INSUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0153] * * claims 1-15 * * figures 1-13 * [I] 5,6,12; | [A]US2016227459 (FUJISHIRO MASATO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0269] * * claims 1-4 * * figures 1-26 *; | [A]WO2016165127 (MEDIATEK SINGAPORE PTE LTD [SG], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 3, line 23 * * page 4, line 24 - page 14, line 18 * * claims 1-11 * * figures 1A-10B *; | [AP]EP3177071 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [AP] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0141] * * claims 1-38 * * figures 1-10 * |