EP3500429 - COATED, METALLIZED FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jindal Innovation Center SRL Zoning Industriel de Latour 6761 Virton / BE | [2022/15] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Jindal Films Americas LLC 411 Pegasus Parkway LaGrange, GA 30240 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNDARARAMAN, Anand 5A rue Schafsstrachen 2510 Strassen / LU | 02 /
HINMAN, Daniel L. 5900 Green Road Farmington NY 14425 / US | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Hindles Limited Clarence House 131-135 George Street Edinburgh, EH2 4JS / GB | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 17884896.6 | 22.12.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017US68160 | Priority number, date | US201662438361P | 22.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662438361 P | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018119381 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3500429 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3500429 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B27/32, B41M5/52, B41M5/50, B32B7/06, B32B7/12, B32B25/04, B32B25/08, B32B25/16, B32B27/10, B32B27/16, B32B27/18, B32B27/30, B32B27/34, B32B27/36 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
B41M5/508 (EP,US);
B32B25/042 (EP);
B32B25/08 (EP);
B32B25/16 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/10 (EP);
B32B27/16 (EP);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/306 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/325 (EP);
B32B27/327 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B7/06 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
B41M5/506 (EP,US);
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2250/05 (EP);
B32B2255/205 (EP);
B32B2255/24 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2255/28 (EP);
B32B2264/0278 (EP);
B32B2264/067 (EP);
B32B2264/102 (EP);
B32B2264/104 (EP);
B32B2270/00 (EP);
B32B2307/40 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
B32B2307/414 (EP);
B32B2307/516 (EP);
B32B2307/518 (EP,US);
B32B2307/538 (EP);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/744 (EP);
B32B2307/748 (EP);
B32B2519/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | B32B27/08, B32B27/32, B41M5/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETE METALLISIERTE FOLIEN | [2019/26] | English: | COATED, METALLIZED FILMS | [2019/26] | French: | FILMS MÉTALLISÉS REVÊTUS | [2019/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 01.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | MC | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
PL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SK | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003026932 (JOHNSON JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0083]; claims 14,18 * [I] 1-9; | [XI]WO2014070241 (JINDAL FILMS AMERICAS LLC [US]) [X] 1-9 * claims 1-12 *[I] 1-9 | International search | [A]US2002182435 (MIGLIORINI ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * ; entire document, but especially: para [0017]- para [0024], para [0053], para [0087] *; | [X]US2003026932 (JOHNSON JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * ; entire document, but especially: para [0001], para [0010]- para [0015], para [0029], para [0032], para [0037], para [0038], para [0040], para [0050], para [0051], para [0057], para [0060], para [0062], para [0075], para [0081], para [0083], para [0126], para [0128], para [0131], para [0144], para [0147] *; | [A]US6720065 (COSENTINO STEVEN R [US]) [A] 1-21 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2008070050 (URBAIN LAURENCE DOMINIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-21 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2012251775 (STEINBECK RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 1-21* ; entire document * | by applicant | US3028622 | US3255099 | US3255034 | US3347697 | US3753769 | US4058645 | US4214039 | US4239827 | US4297187 | US4439493 | US4447494 | US4853602 | US4961992 | US5019447 | US5057177 | US5230963 | EP1125972 | US2003026932 | WO2014070241 | - VILLERMET, Surface and Coatings Technology, (20030000), vol. 174-175, page 899 | US20080062438 |