EP3500429 - COATED, METALLIZED FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Jindal Innovation Center SRL Zoning Industriel de Latour 6761 Virton / BE | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNDARARAMAN, Anand 5A rue Schafsstrachen 2510 Strassen / LU | 02 /
HINMAN, Daniel L. 5900 Green Road Farmington NY 14425 / US | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Hindles Limited Clarence House 131-135 George Street Edinburgh, EH2 4JS / GB | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 17884896.6 | 22.12.2017 | [2019/26] | WO2017US68160 | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 13.12.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/03] | 19.12.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/03] | 19.12.2023 | Date of registration [2024/03] | 06.12.2023 | Date of legal effect [2024/03] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 19.12.2023 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/03] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3500429 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 07 |