EP3564977 - DYE-SENSITIZED SOLAR CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dongjin Semichem Co., Ltd. 644 Baekbeom-ro Seo-gu Incheon 22824 / KR | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Young Mi 35 Pangyo-ro 255beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13486 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jong Bok 35 Pangyo-ro 255beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13486 / KR | 03 /
BAEK, Jong Gyu 35 Pangyo-ro 255beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13486 / KR | 04 /
SHIN, Kyu Soon 35 Pangyo-ro 255beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13486 / KR | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 17885944.3 | 29.12.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017KR15765 | Priority number, date | KR20160184499 | 30.12.2016 Original published format: KR 20160184499 | [2019/45] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018124825 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564977 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/20 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
H01G9/2031 (EP);
H01G9/2077 (KR);
H01G9/2068 (US);
H01G9/2004 (KR,US);
H01G9/2022 (KR,US);
H01G9/2027 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FARBSTOFFSENSIBILISIERTE SOLARZELLE | [2019/45] | English: | DYE-SENSITIZED SOLAR CELL | [2019/45] | French: | CELLULE SOLAIRE À COLORANT | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2019 | Translation filed | 25.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 20.02.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20110061244 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0013]-[0022] and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20130106966 (HYUNDAI HYSCO CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10* See paragraphs [0019]-[0047] and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR20150055960 (CHEIL IND INC [KR], et al) [Y] 5-7 * See paragraphs [0031], [0044] and figure 1. *; | [XY]KR101635758B (KOREA INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-4, 8-10 * See paragraphs [0060]-[0083] and figures 1-2. * [Y] 5-7; | [A]KR101665637B (SOGANG UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0054] and figures 1-3. * |