EP3564104 - CONTROL METHOD FOR USE WITH LONGITUDINAL MOTION-SENSING TWO-WHEELED VEHICLES AND CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd Apt. 1 and 3 of South Building Apt. 3-4 of North Building of Building 9 Qixianqiao Village Liangzhu Town, Yuhang Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310000 / CN | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Hui c/o Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd. Apt. 1 and 3 of South Building Apt. 3-4 of North Building of Building 9 Qixianqiao Village, Liangzhu Town, Yuhang Hangzhou Zhejiang 310000 / CN | [2020/02] |
Former [2019/45] | 01 /
CHEN, Hui North Building 2-3, Building 4 Liangbo Road 249 Liangzhu Street Yuhang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310000 / CN | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 17886925.1 | 03.03.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017CN75512 | Priority number, date | CN201611249777 | 29.12.2016 Original published format: CN201611249777 | [2019/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018120411 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564104 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62K3/00, B62K11/00 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
B62K11/007 (EP,US);
A61B5/11 (US);
B60K26/02 (US);
B60L15/20 (US);
B62J45/416 (EP,CN,US);
B62J45/42 (EP,CN,US);
B62K2204/00 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/45] | B62K3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT LÄNGSBEWEGUNGSABTASTENDEN ZWEIRADFAHRZEUGEN UND STEUERUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/45] | English: | CONTROL METHOD FOR USE WITH LONGITUDINAL MOTION-SENSING TWO-WHEELED VEHICLES AND CONTROL SYSTEM | [2019/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE À UTILISER AVEC DES VÉHICULES À DEUX ROUES À DÉTECTION DE MOUVEMENT LONGITUDINAL ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2019 | Translation filed | 27.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 01.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/16] | 14.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005121238 (ISHII SHINJI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048]; figures -1-17,28-33 * * paragraph [0155] - paragraph [0168]; figures 36-40 * * paragraph [0318] - paragraph [0348]; figures 43-48 *; | [X]US2006231313 (ISHII SHINJI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0088]; figures 8-11 *; | [X]US2008245594 (ISHII SHINJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1,8-13 *; | [X]US2014326525 (DOERKSEN KYLE JONATHAN [US]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]CN106043539 (CHANGZHOU AIRWHEEL INTELLIGENT TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-3* abstract * | International search | [A]CN203844935U (BAO WEI)[A] 1-3; | [A]CN204775712U (DONGGUAN ROBSTEP ROBOT CO LTD) [A] 1-3; | [A]CN105151193 (SHENZHEN QICHUANG LIANFA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-3; | [A]CN205022785U (SHENZHEN YIGEZHIXING TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-3; | [A]WO2016095209 (SHENZHEN SAMPU MOTOR CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-3 |