|
22.08.2024 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2024 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
14.08.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2024 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
14.08.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2024 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.08.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2024 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2024 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.04.2024 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2024 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2024 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2024 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.03.2024 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.03.2024 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
121 |
|
26.03.2024 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.03.2024 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
26.03.2024 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
11.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.01.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
11.01.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.01.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
11.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.12.2022 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2022 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.08.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2022 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2022 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2022 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2022 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2021 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2021 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.05.2021 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2021 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2021 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2020 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
30 |