22.08.2024 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] |
14.08.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.04.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.03.2024 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
27.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2022 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.08.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.08.2022 |
First examination report |
|
13.05.2022 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
31.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2021 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
17.05.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.05.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
17.05.2021 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
04.03.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.07.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
10.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
10.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
06.03.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
06.03.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
27.09.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
27.09.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
10.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.07.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
23.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|