EP3564198 - SILICATE PRODUCT AND STRENGTHENING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tunghsu Group Co., Ltd. No. 369 Zhujiang Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Shijiazhuang Hebei 050000 / CN | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Debao 369 Zhujiang Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Shijiazhuang Hebei 050000 / CN | 02 /
LI, Qing 369 Zhujiang Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Shijiazhuang Hebei 050000 / CN | 03 /
SHEN, Zihan 369 Zhujiang Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Shijiazhuang Hebei 050000 / CN | 04 /
GUO, Feng 369 Zhujiang Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Shijiazhuang Hebei 050000 / CN | 05 /
GONG, Ruhua 369 Zhujiang Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Shijiazhuang Hebei 050000 / CN | 06 /
WANG, Zhonghua 369 Zhujiang Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Shijiazhuang Hebei 050000 / CN | 07 /
CHEN, Jiajia 369 Zhujiang Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Shijiazhuang Hebei 050000 / CN | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla de Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17887110.9 | 10.08.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017CN96879 | Priority number, date | CN201611255858 | 30.12.2016 Original published format: CN201611255858 | [2019/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018120846 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564198 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C03C21/00, C03C3/085 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
C03C3/085 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03C21/002 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03C23/0065 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Title | German: | SILIKATPRODUKT UND VERSTÄRKUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/45] | English: | SILICATE PRODUCT AND STRENGTHENING METHOD THEREOF | [2019/45] | French: | PRODUIT DE SILICATE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RENFORCEMENT ASSOCIÉ | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2019 | Translation filed | 23.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 25.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012111056 (PREST CHRISTOPHER [US]); | [XI]US2015044473 (MURATA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [XAI]WO2015147092 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2016117476 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [XAI]US2016221863 (MURATA TAKASHI [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]CN103803786 (SAMSUNG CORNING PREC MAT CO) [Y] 17-20 * , description, paragraphs [0031]-[0038] *; | [A]WO2015125584 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO [JP]) [A] 1-22* , entire document *; | [X]CN104986954 (CSG HOLDING CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * , claim 1, and embodiment 10 *; | [X]CN105110636 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * , claim 1, and embodiment A18 *; | [XY]CN105985018 (CSG HOLDING CO LTD) [X] 1-8, 21, 22 * , description, paragraphs [0006]-[0017], and table 1, embodiment 6, 1-3, 6-8, 21 and 22 * [Y] 11-20; | [Y]CN106082704 (APPLE INC) [Y] 11-20 * , description, paragraphs [0034]-[0041] *; | [PX]CN106854037 (TUNGHSU GROUP CO LTD) [PX] 1-22 * , claims 1-22 * | by applicant | CN102639457 | CN105102394 |