EP3564109 - ELECTRIC ASSIST SYSTEM AND ELECTRIC ASSIST VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASUMI, Mitsuharu c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 17887877.3 | 21.09.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017JP34146 | Priority number, date | JP20160255870 | 28.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016255870 | [2019/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018123160 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564109 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3564109 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B62M6/45, B60L9/18, B62J99/00, B60L15/10, B60L50/20, B60L15/20 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
B60L15/10 (EP,US);
B60L15/2018 (EP,US);
B60L15/2081 (EP,US);
B60L50/20 (EP);
B60W30/188 (US);
B60W40/076 (US);
B62M6/45 (EP,US);
B62M6/50 (US);
G01P3/487 (US);
B60L2200/12 (EP,US);
B60L2240/12 (EP);
B60L2240/14 (EP,US);
B60L2240/16 (EP,US);
B60L2240/18 (US);
B60L2240/20 (US);
B60L2240/642 (EP);
B60L2260/44 (EP);
B60L9/18 (US);
B62J43/13 (EP,US);
B62M6/80 (US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/45] | B62M6/45, B60L9/18, B62J99/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT ELEKTRISCHER UNTERSTÜTZUNG UND FAHRZEUG MIT ELEKTRISCHER UNTERSTÜTZUNG | [2019/45] | English: | ELECTRIC ASSIST SYSTEM AND ELECTRIC ASSIST VEHICLE | [2019/45] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE ÉLECTRIQUE ET VÉHICULE À ASSISTANCE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2019 | Translation filed | 26.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 17.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22211549.5 / EP4169824 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.2023 | CZ | 25.01.2023 | DK | 25.01.2023 | EE | 25.01.2023 | ES | 25.01.2023 | FI | 25.01.2023 | HR | 25.01.2023 | IT | 25.01.2023 | LT | 25.01.2023 | LV | 25.01.2023 | MC | 25.01.2023 | NL | 25.01.2023 | PL | 25.01.2023 | RO | 25.01.2023 | RS | 25.01.2023 | SE | 25.01.2023 | SI | 25.01.2023 | SK | 25.01.2023 | SM | 25.01.2023 | NO | 25.04.2023 | GR | 26.04.2023 | IS | 25.05.2023 | PT | 25.05.2023 | GB | 21.09.2023 | IE | 21.09.2023 | LU | 21.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | FR | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
IT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
GB | 21.09.2023 | ||
IE | 21.09.2023 | ||
LU | 21.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
FR | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
IT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
GB | 21.09.2023 | ||
IE | 21.09.2023 | ||
LU | 21.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
IT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
LU | 21.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
IT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
LU | 21.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
LU | 21.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 25.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2377713 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [Y] 13* paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031]; figure 3 *; | [XY]US2013179016 (GALE STEPHEN WILLIAM [AU]) [X] 1,2,10,14,16,17 * paragraph [0048]; figure 3; claims 42,43 * [Y] 3-9,11-13,15; | [Y]JP2014088156 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 4-6,9,11 * paragraphs [0031] , [0072] - paragraph [0074]; figure 8 *; | [Y]EP3025898 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 3,15 * claims 4,17 *; | [Y]JP2016150684 (NIDEC COPAL CORP) [Y] 7,8,12 * paragraphs [0032] , [0063]; figure 4 * | International search | [Y]JP2001088770 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 15-17, 19, 22-25, 27-36 * , paragraphs [0016], [0029], fig. 1-13 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2001122186 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 5-6, 9 * , paragraphs [0011], [0013], [0041]-[0045] (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2004306818 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1-25, 27-36 * , paragraphs [0009]-[0026], fig. 1-6 (Family: none) * [A] 26; | [Y]JP2007223579 (SOFUTORONIKUSU KK) [Y] 15-17, 21-25, 27-36 * , paragraph [0019] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2012075280 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 1-9, 22, 31-35 * , paragraphs [0041]-[0048] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014088156 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 24-25, 27-35 * , paragraphs [0073]-[0074], fig. 1-9 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014133552 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 3-6, 9 * , paragraph [0041] & US 2014/0166383 A1, paragraph [0055] & EP 2743164 A1 & CN 103863124 A & CA 2836456 A1 *; | [Y]JP2015189451 (NIDEC COPAL CORP) [Y] 33-35* , paragraph [0023] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015200508 (SONY CORP) [Y] 20, 22-25, 27-36 * , paragraph [0002] & US 2017/0115319 A1, paragraph [0003] & WO 2015/151639 A1 *; | [Y]JP2015209159 (SHIMANO KK) [Y] 15-17, 20, 22-22, 27-36 * , paragraphs [0035], [0042] & US 2015/0307157 A1, paragraphs [0047], [0054] & DE 102015106496 A1 & CN 105035246 A & TW 201540603 A *; | [Y]JP2016008044 (SHIMANO KK) [Y] 3-6, 9 * , paragraphs : [0031], [0040], [0059] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2016030484 (AISIN SEIKI) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0020], [0031] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2016150684 (NIDEC COPAL CORP) [Y] 10-18, 22-25, 27-36 * , paragraphs [0022], [0027]-[0035], [0041]-[0043], [0064], fig. 1-18 (Family: none) * | Examination | JP2004306818 | DE102011083072 | by applicant | JPH09226664 |