EP3565162 - SRS TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR UPLINK BEAM CORRECTION, AND TERMINAL THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Kukheon IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Jiwon IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Kijun IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Kyuseok IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 05 /
AHN, Minki IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Kilbom IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17888188.4 | 26.12.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017KR15454 | Priority number, date | US201762441445P | 02.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762441445 P | [2019/45] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018124685 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3565162 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3565162 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04B7/04, H04B7/06, H04B7/0404 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/35] | H04L5/00, H04B7/04, H04B7/06 | ||
Former IPC [2019/45] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SRS-ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR UPLINK-STRAHLKORREKTUR UND ENDGERÄT DAFÜR | [2019/45] | English: | SRS TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR UPLINK BEAM CORRECTION, AND TERMINAL THEREFOR | [2019/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE SRS UTILISÉ POUR UNE CORRECTION DE FAISCEAU DE LIAISON MONTANTE, ET TERMINAL ASSOCIÉ | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2019 | Translation filed | 16.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 19.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2023 | CZ | 08.02.2023 | DK | 08.02.2023 | EE | 08.02.2023 | ES | 08.02.2023 | FI | 08.02.2023 | HR | 08.02.2023 | IT | 08.02.2023 | LT | 08.02.2023 | LV | 08.02.2023 | NL | 08.02.2023 | PL | 08.02.2023 | RO | 08.02.2023 | RS | 08.02.2023 | SE | 08.02.2023 | SI | 08.02.2023 | SK | 08.02.2023 | SM | 08.02.2023 | NO | 08.05.2023 | GR | 09.05.2023 | IS | 08.06.2023 | PT | 09.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SI | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
LT | 08.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2018097680 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [E] 1,6,11,13 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0187] - paragraph [0194] *; | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Considerations on NR SRS design", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161113), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1611808 NR_SRS_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161113), XP051175777 [A] 1-15 * Sect. 2 * | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Reference Signal design for UL based measurement, CSI acquisition, and beam management", vol. RAN WG1, no. Lisbon, Portugal; 20161010 - 20161014, (20161009), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1609413, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161009), XP051149456 [A] 1-15 * Sect. 2 * | [A] - NOKIA ET AL, "Frame Structure Support for Beam Based Common Control Plane", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20160822 - 20160826, (20160821), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-167265, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20160821), XP051125799 [A] 1-15 * Sect. 2 * | International search | [A]US2011268028 (STERN-BERKOWITZ JANET A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0061]-[0065]. *; | [A] - HUAWEI et al., "UL SRS Design for CSI Acquisition and Beam Management", R1-1611678, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #87, Reno, USA, (20161105), XP051190082 [A] 1-15 * See section 2.2; and figure 3. * | [A] - Qualcomm Incorporated, "Views on SRS", R1-1612049, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #87, Reno, Nevada , USA, (20161105), XP051190281 [A] 1-15 * See sections 2.2, 2.3. * | [A] - NOKIA et al., "UL SRS Design Considerations in NR", R1-1612861, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 Meeting #87, Reno , USA, (20161104), XP051189512 [A] 1-15 * See section 2. * | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Considerations on NR SRS Design", R1-1611808, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #8 7, Reno, USA, (20161105), XP051190158 [A] 1-15 * See sections 2.2, 2.3. * |