EP3434693 - COMPOSITION FOR DIFFERENTIATION OF DENTAL PULP STEM CELLS INTO ODONTOBLAST PROGENITOR CELLS AND IGG OR IGM TYPE MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY SPECIFICALLY BINDING TO SURFACE OF ODONTOBLAST PROGENITOR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dankook University Cheonan Campus Industry Academic Cooperation Foundation 119, dandae-ro Dongnam-gu Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do 31116 / KR | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Young Joo 204-203 221 Seolleung-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06276 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Kyung Jung 1-713 14-6 Munam 2-gil Dongnam-gu Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do 31065 / KR | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17888522.4 | 21.12.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017KR15269 | Priority number, date | KR20160179277 | 26.12.2016 Original published format: KR 20160179277 | KR20170164380 | 01.12.2017 Original published format: KR 20170164380 | KR20170164410 | 01.12.2017 Original published format: KR 20170164410 | [2019/05] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018124642 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3434693 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C12N5/12, C12N5/077, G01N33/569 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
C12N5/0654 (EP,US);
A61K35/32 (US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
C12N5/0607 (US);
C12N5/0664 (EP,US);
G01N33/5073 (US);
G01N33/53 (US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
C12N2501/15 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR DIFFERENZIERUNG VON ZAHNMARKSTAMMZELLEN IN ODONTOBLASTENVORLÄUFERZELLEN UND MONOKLONALER IGG- ODER IGM-TYP-ANTIKÖRPER MIT SPEZIFISCHER BINDUNG AN OBERFLÄCHEN VON ODONTOBLASTENVORLÄUFERZELLEN | [2019/05] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR DIFFERENTIATION OF DENTAL PULP STEM CELLS INTO ODONTOBLAST PROGENITOR CELLS AND IGG OR IGM TYPE MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY SPECIFICALLY BINDING TO SURFACE OF ODONTOBLAST PROGENITOR CELLS | [2019/05] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LA DIFFÉRENCIATION DE CELLULES SOUCHES DE PULPE DENTAIRE EN CELLULES PROGÉNITRICES DES ODONTOBLASTES ET ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL DE TYPE IGG OU IGM SE LIANT SPÉCIFIQUEMENT À LA SURFACE DE CELLULES PROGÉNITRICES DES ODONTOBLASTES | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2018 | Translation filed | 26.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 23.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Unknown, "Human DMP-1 Antibody", (20150313), URL: https://fnkprddata.blob.core.windows.net/domestic/data/datasheet/RSD/MAB4129.pdf, (20190513), XP055588021 [I] 1-3,8-13 * the whole document * | [I] - OZEKI NOBUAKI ET AL, "Gelatin scaffold combined with bone morphogenetic protein-4 induces odontoblast-like cell differentiation involving integrin profile changes, autophagy-related gene 10, and Wnt5 sequentially in human induced pluripotent stem cells", DIFFERENTIATION, SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, (20160915), vol. 93, doi:10.1016/J.DIFF.2016.09.002, ISSN 0301-4681, pages 1 - 14, XP029900365 [I] 1-3,8-13 * the whole document, in particular under items 2.8 and 3.5, figure 2.(c) and (d) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.diff.2016.09.002 | [ ] - Unknown, "DSPP (LFMb-21): sc-73632", (20100101), URL: https://datasheets.scbt.com/sc-73632.pdf, (20190513), XP055588001 [ ] * the whole document * | [A] - JE. AUBIN, "New Immunological Approaches to Studying the Odontoblast", JOURNAL OF DENTAL RESEARCH, US, (19850429), vol. 64, no. 4, doi:10.1177/002203458506400404, ISSN 0022-0345, pages 515 - 522, XP055587852 [A] 1-3,8-13 * page 519, column r, line 22 - page 520, column r, line 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/002203458506400404 | [A] - CASAGRANDE L ET AL., "Dentin-derived BMP-2 and Odontoblast Differentiation", JOURNAL OF DENTAL RESEARCH, (20100601), vol. 89, no. 6, doi:10.1177/0022034510364487, ISSN 0022-0345, pages 603 - 608, XP009513151 [A] 1-3,8-13 * the whole document, in particular discussion and figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0022034510364487 | International search | [Y]US2013029292 (MAR KWEI [TW], et al) [Y] 1-7 * ^ [0005], [0071], [0089] . *; | [Y] - ZHANG, F. et al., "Wnt and BMP signaling crosstalk in regulating dental stem cells: implications in dental tissue engineering", Genes & Diseases, (20161005), vol. 3, pages 263 - 276, XP 055537137 [Y] 1-7 * 270, "BMPs in dental tissue engineering" * | [Y] - YANG, W., "Bmp2 is required for odontoblast differentiation and pulp vasculogenesis", Journal of Dental Research, (20120000), vol. 91, no. 1, pages 58 - 64, XP 055537142 [Y] 1-7 * . * | [A] - "Role of OD314 During Odontoblast Differentiation", Korean Journal of Physical Anthropology, (20050000), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 187 - 196, XP009511490 [A] 1-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.11637/kjpa.2005.18.3.187 | [XP] - KANG, K.-J. et al., "Immunomic screening of human odontoblast-specific cell surface molecules", 18th International Meeting of Korean Tissue Engineering and Regenerative Medicine Society, (20170602), pages 2 - 81 [XP] 1-7 * . * | [XP] - KANG, K.-J., "Cytodifferentiation of hDPSCs into odontoblasts and screening of odontoblast-specific cell surface markers", 2017 Annual Meeting of Korean Society for Stem Cell Research, Seoul, Korea, (20170817), page P-030 [XP] 1-7 * . * |