EP3563911 - OUTPUT CONTROL DEVICE, OUTPUT CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2019/45] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Osamu c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 17888695.8 | 10.11.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017JP40601 | Priority number, date | JP20160252665 | 27.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016252665 | [2019/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018123293 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3563911 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3563911 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/00, G06F3/01, G09B19/00 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
G09B19/0015 (EP,US);
G09B19/003 (US);
A63B69/00 (EP);
G06F3/01 (EP);
G06F3/011 (US);
G08B6/00 (US);
G09B19/0038 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0655 (US);
A63B2220/62 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGABESTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, AUSGABESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2019/45] | English: | OUTPUT CONTROL DEVICE, OUTPUT CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2019/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE SORTIE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE SORTIE, ET PROGRAMME | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2019 | Translation filed | 17.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 26.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2023 | CZ | 14.06.2023 | DK | 14.06.2023 | EE | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | FI | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | IT | 14.06.2023 | LT | 14.06.2023 | LV | 14.06.2023 | MC | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SE | 14.06.2023 | SI | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | PT | 16.10.2023 | LU | 10.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008049151 (BAKER RICHARD JOHN [AU]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]WO2009123396 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0017] , [0025] - [0068]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2013089843 (HUTCHISON SEAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US9173596 (BERME NECIP [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 8, lines 28-48 * * column 9, lines 51-61 * * column 10, line 50 - column 11, line 12 * * column 11, lines 54-62 * * column 12, lines 38-58 * * column 13, lines 47-61 * * column 15, line 65 - column 16, line 24 * * column 16, lines 35-67 * * column 17, lines 1-17 * * column 21, lines 26-36 * * column 24, lines 21-51 * * column 27, lines 24-36 * * column 29, lines 24-26 * * figures 1-4,7,26-28 * | International search | [XA]US2004077975 (ZIMMERMAN JEFFREY C [US]) [X] 1-6, 9-20 * , paragraphs [0055]-[0058], [0063]-[0066] & WO 2004/039055 A2 & AU 2003285918 A * [A] 7-8; | [XA]JP2007167203 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-6, 9-20 * , paragraphs [0017]-[0047] (Family: none) * [A] 7-8; | [A]US2010173276 (VASIN MAXIM ALEXEEVICH [RU]) [A] 1-20 * , entire text, all drawings & GB 2462780 A & WO 2009/002218 A1 & DE 112008001625 T & RU 2007122577 A & CN 101801471 A *; | [A]JP2011087794 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-20* , paragraphs [0076]-[0077], [0097] & US 2011/0097695 A1, paragraphs [0213]-[0216], [0268]-[0270] & US 2015/0262503 A1 & CN 102039042 A *; | [XA]JP2011516915 (ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE) [X] 1-6, 9-20 * , paragraphs [0024]-[0049] & US 2011/0006926 A1, paragraphs [0028]-[0053] & WO 2009/123396 A2 & EP 2262573 A2 & KR 10-2009-0105785 A & CN 101983090 A * [A] 7-8; | [PX]JP2017136142 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [PX] 1-2, 4, 6, 9-10, 13, 17-20 * , paragraphs, [0043]-[0178] & US 2017/0221379 A1, paragraphs [0061]-[0197] * | by applicant | JP2016047207 |