EP3565304 - COMMUNICATION METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/31] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
Former [2019/45] | For all designated states Guangdong OPPO Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Ning No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 17889866.4 | 04.01.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017CN70187 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018126364 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3565304 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3565304 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W28/16 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
H04W72/23 (EP,RU,US);
H04W28/16 (IL,KR,RU);
H04W24/02 (CN,IL);
H04W72/56 (CN,US);
H04W72/044 (IL,KR,US);
H04W72/53 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | H04W72/04 | ||
Former IPC [2019/45] | H04W28/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2019/45] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2019/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2019 | Translation filed | 02.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 19.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21184455.0 / EP3930400 | EP24195117.7 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.01.2017 | AL | 04.08.2021 | AT | 04.08.2021 | CY | 04.08.2021 | CZ | 04.08.2021 | DK | 04.08.2021 | EE | 04.08.2021 | FI | 04.08.2021 | HR | 04.08.2021 | LT | 04.08.2021 | LV | 04.08.2021 | MC | 04.08.2021 | MK | 04.08.2021 | PL | 04.08.2021 | RO | 04.08.2021 | RS | 04.08.2021 | SE | 04.08.2021 | SI | 04.08.2021 | SK | 04.08.2021 | SM | 04.08.2021 | BG | 04.11.2021 | NO | 04.11.2021 | GR | 05.11.2021 | IS | 04.12.2021 | PT | 06.12.2021 | IE | 04.01.2022 | LU | 04.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
MK | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
IE | 04.01.2022 | ||
LU | 04.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
IE | 04.01.2022 | ||
LU | 04.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
IE | 04.01.2022 | ||
LU | 04.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016113008 (DAMNJANOVIC JELENA [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2016269212 (VILAIPORNSAWAI USA [CA], et al); | [A]CN105979597 (YULONG COMPUTER TELECOMMUNICATION SCIENTIFIC SHENZHEN CO LTD ); | [A]CN106231614 (SHENZHEN GIONEE COMMUNICATION EQUIPMENT CO LTD); | [A]CN106231677 (YULONG COMPUTER TELECOMMUNICATION SCIENTIFIC SHENZHEN CO LTD ); | [A]CN106255215 (YULONG COMPUTER TELECOMMUNICATION SCIENTIFIC SHENZHEN CO LTD ) |