EP3567575 - DISPLAY DEVICE AND DRIVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 1-5-1, Taito Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKADA Takehisa c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-5-1, Taito, Taito-ku 110-0016 Tokyo / JP | 02 /
ISHIZAKI Mamoru c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-5-1, Taito, Taito-ku 110-0016 Tokyo / JP | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 17890789.5 | 06.12.2017 | [2019/46] | WO2017JP43728 | Priority number, date | JP20170001141 | 06.01.2017 Original published format: JP 2017001141 | [2019/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018128040 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3567575 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/34, G02F1/167, G09G3/20 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
G02F1/1685 (EP,US);
G02F1/167 (EP,US);
G02F1/16761 (US);
G02F1/16766 (US);
G09G3/344 (EP,US);
G02F2001/1678 (US);
G09G2300/0452 (EP);
G09G2310/06 (EP);
G09G2310/068 (US);
G09G2320/0242 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND ANSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/46] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE AND DRIVING METHOD | [2019/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2019 | Translation filed | 24.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 26.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/39] | 12.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015097877 (LIN CRAIG [US], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2013250406 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-14* , *; | [X]JP2016537687 [X] 1-14 * , * | by applicant | JP2015532461 |