EP3569739 - METHOD OF PRODUCING AMMONIUM PERSULFATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHII, Mio c/o Tokyo Head Office Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1 Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | 02 /
TEZUKA, Mikihito c/o Tokai Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 31 Shinpo-machi Tokai-shi Aichi 476-8567 / JP | 03 /
FUKUDA, Fumio c/o Tokai Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 31 Shinpo-machi Tokai-shi Aichi 476-8567 / JP | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17891882.7 | 27.12.2017 | [2019/47] | WO2017JP47065 | Priority number, date | JP20170003993 | 13.01.2017 Original published format: JP 2017003993 | JP20170161111 | 24.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017161111 | [2019/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018131493 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3569739 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/28, C25B1/30, C25B1/00 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
C25B1/00 (EP);
C25B1/29 (EP,KR,US);
C01C1/24 (KR,US);
C25B11/03 (KR,US);
C25B11/04 (KR,US);
C25B15/08 (KR);
C25B9/19 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/47] | C25B1/28, C25B1/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AMMONIUMPERSULFAT | [2019/47] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING AMMONIUM PERSULFATE | [2019/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PERSULFATE D'AMMONIUM | [2019/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2019 | Translation filed | 05.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 29.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB746786 (ROHM & HAAS) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]CN104152943 (UNIV SOUTHEAST, et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [XY]WO9716584 (HURON TECH CORP [US]) [X] 1, 3, 6 * , * [Y] 7; | [Y]JP2000038691 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO)[Y] 6-7; | [XY]KR101528911B (TECHWIN CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5 [Y] 6-7; | [XY] - SUGINO, Kiichiro et al., "Preparation of Ammonium Persulfate at Our Electrodeposited Lead Peroxide Anode (Consisted of Lead Peroxide Only)", The Journal of Chemical Society of Japan Chemistry Section, vol. 50, no. 4-5, doi:10.1246/nikkashi1898.50.34, (19470501), pages 34 - 38, XP009515454 [X] 1-6 [Y] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/nikkashi1898.50.34 | by applicant | JPS57198275 | JPH11293484 | JP2001220695 |