EP3483257 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING BENZALDEHYDE USING MICROORGANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xiamen Oamic Biotechnology Co., Ltd. Room 236 No.2999 Dongfu Road Dongfu Town Haicang District Xiamen City, Fujian 361000 / CN | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XING, Chenguang Room 236 No.2999 Dongfu Road Dongfu Town Haicang District Xiamen Fujian 361000 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Xijing Room 236 No.2999 Dongfu Road Dongfu Town Haicang District Xiamen Fujian 361000 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Zhiqiang Room 236 No.2999 Dongfu Road Dongfu Town Haicang District Xiamen Fujian 361000 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Wei Room 236 No.2999 Dongfu Road Dongfu Town Haicang District Xiamen Fujian 361000 / CN | 05 /
GONG, Hongcan Room 236 No.2999 Dongfu Road Dongfu Town Haicang District Xiamen Fujian 361000 / CN | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Verscht, Thomas Kurt Albert Josephsburgstrasse 88 A 81673 München / DE | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 17892107.8 | 10.08.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017CN96860 | Priority number, date | CN20171051824 | 20.01.2017 Original published format: CN201710051824 | [2019/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018133395 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3483257 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3483257 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, C12P7/24, // C12R1/37 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
C12P7/24 (EP,CN);
C12N1/205 (EP,CN);
C12R2001/37 (EP,CN)
|
Former IPC [2019/20] | C12N1/20, C12P7/24, C12R1/37 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BENZALDEHYD UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MIKROORGANISMEN | [2019/20] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING BENZALDEHYDE USING MICROORGANISM | [2019/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BENZALDÉHYDE METTANT EN OEUVRE UN MICRO-ORGANISME | [2019/20] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2019 | Translation filed | 07.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 14.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.08.2017 | AL | 29.09.2021 | AT | 29.09.2021 | CY | 29.09.2021 | CZ | 29.09.2021 | DK | 29.09.2021 | EE | 29.09.2021 | ES | 29.09.2021 | FI | 29.09.2021 | HR | 29.09.2021 | IT | 29.09.2021 | LT | 29.09.2021 | LV | 29.09.2021 | MC | 29.09.2021 | MK | 29.09.2021 | MT | 29.09.2021 | NL | 29.09.2021 | PL | 29.09.2021 | RO | 29.09.2021 | RS | 29.09.2021 | SE | 29.09.2021 | SI | 29.09.2021 | SK | 29.09.2021 | SM | 29.09.2021 | TR | 29.09.2021 | BG | 29.12.2021 | NO | 29.12.2021 | GR | 30.12.2021 | IS | 29.01.2022 | PT | 31.01.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 10.08.2017 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
MK | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
TR | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 10.08.2017 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
MK | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 10.08.2017 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 10.08.2017 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 10.08.2017 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 29.09.2021 | |
NO | 29.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20110067308 (BIOTOPIA CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A] - CASEY J ET AL, "Microbial routes to aromatic aldehydes", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, STONEHAM, MA, US, vol. 14, no. 9, doi:10.1016/0141-0229(92)90114-4, ISSN 0141-0229, (19920901), pages 739 - 747, (19920901), XP023679685 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-0229(92)90114-4 | [A] - MASJA N. NIEROP GROOT ET AL, "Conversion of Phenylalanine to Benzaldehyde Initiated by an Aminotransferase in Lactobacillus plantarum", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19980101), vol. 64, no. 8, doi:10.1128/AEM.64.8.3009-3013.1998, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 3009 - 3013, XP055655995 [A] 3-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.64.8.3009-3013.1998 | International search | [A]EP0193257 (NIPA LAB LTD [GB])[A] 1-9; | [A]CN101054365 (QINGYUAN PROFESSION TECHNOLOGY [CN]) [A] 1-9; | [A]CN101084313 (HYOSUNG CORP [KR]) [A] 1-9; | [A]CN101985414 (CHINA TUHSU FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES IMP AND EXP CO LTD) [A] 1-9; | [XP] - (20170430) [XP] 1-9 | [A] - TRIVEDI, M.K., "Phenotyping and Genotyping Characterization of Proteus vu- lgaris After Biofield Treatment", International Journal of Genetics and Genomics, (20150000), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 66 - 73, XP055505493 [A] 1-9 |