EP3571349 - TEXTURIZED PRINTABLE COATING AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neenah, Inc. 3460 Preston Ridge Road Suite 600 Alpharetta GA 30005 / US | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SWOBODA, Dean c/o Neenah Paper Inc. 3460 Preston Ridge Road Suite 600 Alpharetta, Georgia 30005 / US | 02 /
CHANEY-RYAN, Brie c/o Neenah Paper Inc. 3460 Preston Ridge Road Suite 600 Alpharetta, Georgia 30005 / US | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Biggi, Cristina, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2019/48] | Application number, filing date | 17893196.0 | 15.12.2017 | [2019/48] | WO2017US66632 | Priority number, date | US201762446954P | 17.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762446954 P | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018136178 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3571349 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3571349 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D21H19/66, D21H19/36, D21H19/44, D21H19/54, D21H19/40, D21H19/42 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
D21H19/36 (EP);
D21H19/66 (EP,US);
D21H19/385 (EP,US);
D21H19/40 (EP);
D21H19/42 (EP,US);
D21H19/54 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/48] | D21H19/66, D21H19/36, D21H19/44, D21H19/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEXTURIERTE BEDRUCKBARE BESCHICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/48] | English: | TEXTURIZED PRINTABLE COATING AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME | [2019/48] | French: | REVÊTEMENT IMPRIMABLE TEXTURÉ ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION D'UN TEL REVÊTEMENT IMPRIMABLE TEXTURÉ | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 14.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0369693 (KANZAKI PAPER MFG CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 640 *; | [Y]JP2001205920 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0035] , [ 0036] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0066] *; | [A]US2008038553 (AVAZZERI LAURENCE [FR]) [A] 1-15* example 5 *; | [Y]US2012214007 (DANIELS CHRISTIAN LEONARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] *; | [A]EP2684916 (OMYA INT AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-31 * | International search | [A]US3409569 (LANE ROBERT E, et al) [A] 1-2, 3/1-2, 4/1-2, 5/1-2, 6/5/1-2, 7/1-2, 8/7/1-2, 9/1-2, 10/1-2, 11/10/1-2, 12/1-2, 13/1-2, 14/1-2, 15/1-2, 16/1-2, 17/1-2, 18/1-2, 19-20* ; entire document *; | [Y]US6231970 (ANDERSEN PER JUST [US], et al) [Y] 1-2, 3/1-2, 4/1-2, 5/1-2, 6/5/1-2, 7/1-2, 8/7/1-2, 9/1-2, 10/1-2, 11/10/1-2, 12/1-2, 13/1-2, 14/1-2, 15/1-2,16/1-2, 17/1-2, 18/1-2, 19-20 * ; abstract; column 15, lines 66-67; column 16, lines 1-8; column 30, lines 52-67; column 32, lines 6-9; column 48, lines 1-9; column 49, lines 29-36; column 52, lines 1-14 *; | [Y]US6372361 (MACKEWICZ VICTOR L [US], et al) [Y] 4/1-2 * ; abstract; column 3, lines 31-35, 48-61 *; | [Y]US2003152724 (SWOBODA DEAN P [US], et al) [Y] 1-2, 3/1-2, 4/1-2, 5/1-2, 6/5/1-2, 7/1-2, 8/7/1-2, 9/1-2, 10/1-2, 11/10/1-2, 12/1-2, 13/1-2, 14/1-2, 15/1-2, 16/1-2, 17/1-2, 18/1-2, 19-20 * ; paragraphs [0029], [0036], [0128], [0130]-[0131], [0135], [0137]; claims 1, 41 *; | [Y]US2003175501 (CONCANNON PAUL W [US], et al) [Y] 15/1-2 * ; abstract; claims 1, 10 *; | [A]US2005106357 (MAYADE THIERRY [FR]) [A] 1-2, 3/1-2, 4/1-2, 5/1-2, 6/5/1-2, 7/1-2, 8/7/1-2, 9/1-2,10/1-2, 11/10/1-2, 12/1-2,13/1-2,14/1-2, 15/1-2, 16/1-2, 17/1-2, 18/1-2, 19-20 * ; entire document *; | [Y]JP2009013513 (DAIO SEISHI KK) [Y] 18/1-2 * ; see English translation; abstract *; | [Y]US2011224348 (AARNI ESKO [FI], et al) [Y] 10/1-2, 11/10/1-2 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0015], [0023]; table 1 *; | [Y]JP4819289B (JUJO PAPER CO LTD) [Y] 9/1-2 * ; see English translation; abstract *; | [Y]US2013011689 (REAGAN EUGENE [US], et al) [Y] 5/1-2, 6/5/1-2 * ; paragraphs [0034], [0048]; claims 1, 11, 17 * | by applicant | US5242739 | US5501902 | US5798179 |