EP3573761 - IMPROVEMENTS IN STIRRED BEAD GRINDING MILLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Outotec Finland Oy Lokomonkatu 3 33900 Tampere / FI | For all designated states Swiss Tower Mills Minerals AG Haselstrasse 1 5401 Baden / CH | [2023/04] |
Former [2022/46] | For all designated states Metso Minerals Oy Lokomonkatu 3 33900 Tampere / FI | ||
For all designated states Swiss Tower Mills Minerals AG Haselstrasse 1 5401 Baden / CH | |||
Former [2019/49] | For all designated states Outotec (Finland) Oy Rauhalanpuisto 9 02230 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states Swiss Tower Mills Minerals AG Haselstrasse 1 5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELKE, Jeff 40 Kings Park Road West Perth, Western Australia 6005 / AU | 02 /
HEATH, Alex 8 Thrum Close Leeming Perth, Western Australia 6149 / AU | 03 /
JAMIESON, Edward Allan 104 Leake Street Bayswater, Western Australia 6053 / AU | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 17893658.9 | 26.01.2017 | [2019/49] | WO2017FI50042 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018138405 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3573761 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 02.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B02C17/16, B02C17/22, B02C17/18 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
B02C17/16 (EP,EA,US);
B02C17/18 (EP,EA);
B02C17/22 (EP,EA,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/49] | B02C17/16, B02C17/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN RÜHRWERKSKUGELMÜHLEN | [2019/49] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN STIRRED BEAD GRINDING MILLS | [2019/49] | French: | PERFECTIONNEMENTS APPORTÉS À DES BROYEURS À BILLES AGITÉES | [2019/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 05.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2014008473 (YANASE SHIGEO [JP]) [X] 1-7,11-15 * figures 1,2,5,7,17 *[A] 8-10,16-20 | International search | [Y]US4174074 (GEIGER ARMIN [CH]); | [Y]US5379952 (GEIGER ARMIN [CH]); | [A]JP3945717B (DAITO DOBOKU:KK) | [Y]US4174074 (GEIGER ARMIN [CH]) [Y] 1-7, 17-44 * column 8, lines 17-56 and figures 1, 3 and 7 *; | [Y]US5379952 (GEIGER ARMIN [CH]) [Y] 1-7, 17-44 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 6 and figure 1 *; | [A]JP3945717B (DAITO DOBOKU:KK) [A] 1-44* figures 5, 6 and 7 & machine translation into English by Clarivate Analytics [online] EPOQUENET TXPJPEB * |