EP3573543 - CIRCULAR STAPLING DEVICE AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURTHY ARAVALLI, Anantha Venkata c/o Chakravarthi Flat No. 304 Lane No. 3 Sri Sai kota's sunshine appartment, RTC Hyderabad 500049 / IN | [2020/13] |
Former [2019/49] | 01 /
MURTHY ARAVALLI, Anantha, Venkata Varaha, Lakshmi, Narasimha, Srinivasa S/O A.Ramakrishna Tanuku Hyderabad 534 211 Andhra Pradesh / IN | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 17894018.5 | 21.03.2017 | [2019/49] | WO2017US23353 | Priority number, date | IN201741002959 | 25.01.2017 Original published format: IN201741002959 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018140066 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3573543 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/115, A61B17/068, A61B17/11, A61B17/072, A61B17/00, A61F5/445 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
A61B17/1155 (EP,US);
A61B17/1114 (EP,US);
A61B17/07292 (EP,US);
A61F5/445 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0042 (EP);
A61B2017/00424 (US);
A61B2017/00473 (EP);
A61B2017/07257 (US);
A61B2017/07285 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/49] | A61B17/115, A61B17/068 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Title | German: | KREISFÖRMIGE KLAMMERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2019/49] | English: | CIRCULAR STAPLING DEVICE AND METHOD OF USE | [2019/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AGRAFAGE CIRCULAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2019/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 31.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/06] | Divisional application(s) | EP19207263.5 / EP3639755 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP1588667 (POLYGANICS BV [NL]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0029]; figures 3-6,8 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * [Y] 2; | [I]US2011278346 (HULL JOANNE [US], et al) [I] 1,2 * paragraphs [0089] , [0108] - [0110]; figures 7,12 *; | [Y]EP2620105 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [Y] 2* figures 2,12,13; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]US4207898 (BECHT CARL T [US]) [Y] 16-20 * See column 5, lines 34-59; column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 31; and figures 1, 2, 9. *; | [A]US2005023325 (GRESHAM RICHARD D [US], et al) [A] 14-20 * See the whole document. *; | [Y]US8453910 (BETTUCHI MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 15 * See column 10, line 63 - column 11, line 27; and figures 15, 16. *; | [XY]US2013214027 (HESSLER THOMAS R [US], et al) [X] 14 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0005], [0061]-[0064], [0068], [0072]-[0079], [0102], [0105], [0106]; and figures 1-4. * [Y] 15-20; | [A]US2014166727 (SWAYZE JEFFREY S [US], et al) [A] 14-20* See the whole document. * |