EP3567812 - METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM FOR ADJUSTING A FORWARDING PATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Nan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHUANG, Shunwan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Jing Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
RAO, Yuan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Haibo Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17894204.1 | 09.11.2017 | [2019/46] | WO2017CN110188 | Priority number, date | CN20171055193 | 24.01.2017 Original published format: CN201710055193 | [2019/46] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018137384 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3567812 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3567812 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/721, H04L12/813, H04L12/851, H04L12/741 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
H04L47/24 (EP);
H04L45/14 (CN);
H04L47/2433 (CN,US);
H04L45/74 (EP,CN);
H04L45/745 (EP,US);
H04L47/17 (US);
H04L47/20 (EP);
H04L47/2483 (US);
H04L63/101 (US);
H04L45/72 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/46] | H04L12/721 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR ANPASSUNG EINES WEITERLEITUNGSWEGS | [2019/46] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM FOR ADJUSTING A FORWARDING PATH | [2019/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT D'AJUSTER UN TRAJET DE TRANSFERT | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2019 | Translation filed | 05.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 10.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2017 | AL | 28.07.2021 | AT | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | ES | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | IT | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | MT | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | TR | 28.07.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IE | 09.11.2021 | LU | 09.11.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 09.11.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
TR | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IE | 09.11.2021 | ||
LU | 09.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 09.11.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IE | 09.11.2021 | ||
LU | 09.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 09.11.2017 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IE | 09.11.2021 | ||
LU | 09.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IE | 09.11.2021 | ||
LU | 09.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IE | 09.11.2021 | ||
LU | 09.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
LU | 09.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
LU | 09.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
LU | 09.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN104994065 (SHANGHAI FEIXUN COMM CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * page 4 *; | [A]CN105847300 (BEIJING PIPAXING TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15* page 16 - page 17 * |