EP3576425 - HEADPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlphaTheta Corporation 4-4-5, Minatomirai Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0012 / JP | [2020/30] |
Former [2019/49] | For all designated states Pioneer DJ Corporation 4-4-5, Minatomirai Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO Ryuichi c/o Pioneer DJ CORPORATION 4-4-5 Minatomirai Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0012 / JP | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 17894325.4 | 27.01.2017 | [2019/49] | WO2017JP03042 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018138891 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3576425 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, // H04R5/033 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
H04R1/1066 (EP,US);
H04R1/1008 (EP,US);
H04R5/033 (EP,US);
H04R1/1041 (EP);
H04R5/0335 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/49] | H04R1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Title | German: | KOPFHÖRER | [2019/49] | English: | HEADPHONE | [2019/49] | French: | CASQUE D'ÉCOUTE | [2019/49] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2019 | Translation filed | 09.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 10.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5933386U ; | [X]JP2013172371 (MK DENSHI KK); | [XA]JP2015026948 (FOSTER ELECTRIC CO LTD) | International search | [XA]JP2015026948 (FOSTER ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1, 2, 14 * , paragraphs [0024] to [0038]; fig. 1 to 16 (Family: none) * [A] 3-13; | [A]JP2005094603 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015027102 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP, et al) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015192288 (PIONEER DJ CORP) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010239200 (ELECOM CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008205585 (HOSIDEN CORP) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013172371 (MK DENSHI KK) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings & WO 2013/125355 A1 entire text; all drawings * | by applicant | JP2016005058 |