EP3557816 - SELF-DIAGNOSIS METHOD FOR COMMUNICATION PROTOCOL OF SECURITY-LEVEL INSTRUMENTATION AND CONTROL SYSTEM OF NUCLEAR POWER PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Techenergy Co., Ltd Bldg. 5 No. 5 Yongfeng Rd. Haidian Beijing 100094 / CN | For all designated states China General Nuclear Power Corporation (CGN) Floors 17~19 Shenzhen Science and Technology Building No. 1001 Shangbu Middle Road Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518027 / CN | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Guojin Bldg. 5 No. 5 Yongfeng Rd. Haidian Beijing 100094 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jingwei Bldg. 5 No. 5 Yongfeng Rd. Haidian Beijing 100094 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Chunlei Bldg. 5 No. 5 Yongfeng Rd. Haidian Beijing 100094 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Zhihui Bldg. 5 No. 5 Yongfeng Rd. Haidian Beijing 100094 / CN | 05 /
JIN, Chengri Bldg. 5 No. 5 Yongfeng Rd. Haidian Beijing 100094 / CN | 06 /
GAO, Chao Bldg. 5 No. 5 Yongfeng Rd. Haidian Beijing 100094 / CN | 07 /
MA, Zhaoyang Bldg. 5 No. 5 Yongfeng Rd. Haidian Beijing 100094 / CN | 08 /
MA, Guangqiang Bldg. 5 No. 5 Yongfeng Rd. Haidian Beijing 100094 / CN | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/43] | Lapienis, Juozas MSP Europe UAB 21-92 Seimyniskiu Str. 09236 Vilnius / LT | Application number, filing date | 17894461.7 | 24.01.2017 | [2019/43] | WO2017CN72495 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018137147 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3557816 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
H04L41/0681 (EP);
H04L41/00 (EP);
Y04S40/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Title | German: | SELBSTDIAGNOSEVERFAHREN FÜR KOMMUNIKATIONSPROTOKOLL EINES SICHERHEITSSTUFENINSTRUMENTES UND STEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN KERNKRAFTWERK | [2019/43] | English: | SELF-DIAGNOSIS METHOD FOR COMMUNICATION PROTOCOL OF SECURITY-LEVEL INSTRUMENTATION AND CONTROL SYSTEM OF NUCLEAR POWER PLANT | [2019/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AUTO-DIAGNOSTIC DE PROTOCOLE DE COMMUNICATION DE SYSTÈME D'INSTRUMENTATION ET DE COMMANDE DE NIVEAU DE SÉCURITÉ D'UNE CENTRALE NUCLÉAIRE | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2019 | Translation filed | 16.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 07.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006054836 (UTE ELECTRONICS & TELECOMMUNICATIONS RES INST [KR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0063] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP2053774 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0093] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2010192051 (KABULEPA LUKUSA DIDIER [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0040] ** figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2014126580 (SAMPATH HEMANTH [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0156] * * figures 1, 11 * | International search | [A]US2002010874 (BARTHEL HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1-11* , entire document *; | [A]CN102082773 (BEIJING TECHENERGY ENGINEERING CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-11 * , claims 1-11, description, paragraphs 30-34 and 46, and figures 1-6 *; | [A]CN103391223 (CHANGCHUN POWER SUPPLY CO LTD JILIN ELECTRIC POWER CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-11 * , entire document *; | [A]CN103457791 (STATE GRID CORP CHINA, et al) [A] 1-11 * , entire document *; | [A]CN105450469 (XUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-11 * , entire document * | by applicant | CN102984097 | CN103457791 |