EP3534485 - BATTERY PACK, BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, AND METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sanggu 150-20 Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Youn Gu 150-20 Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 17895078.8 | 01.11.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017KR12256 | Priority number, date | KR20170015182 | 02.02.2017 Original published format: KR 20170015182 | [2019/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018143541 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3534485 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3534485 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H01M10/42, G01R31/36, G01R1/20, B60L50/64 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
H02J7/00308 (EP);
H02J7/0031 (EP,KR,US);
G01R1/20 (EP,US);
B60L50/64 (EP,US);
B60L58/22 (KR,US);
G01R1/203 (KR,US);
G01R31/36 (EP);
G01R31/382 (KR,US);
H01M10/42 (EP,US);
H02J7/00 (EP);
H02J7/0014 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2010/4271 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/13] | H02J7/00, G01R31/36, G01R1/20, H01M10/42, B60L50/50 | ||
Former IPC [2019/36] | H02J7/00, B60L11/18, G01R31/36, G01R1/20, H01M10/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACK, BATTERIEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/36] | English: | BATTERY PACK, BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, AND METHOD THEREFOR | [2019/36] | French: | BLOC-BATTERIE, SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE BATTERIE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2019 | Translation filed | 31.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 21.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.01.2023 | DK | 18.01.2023 | EE | 18.01.2023 | ES | 18.01.2023 | FI | 18.01.2023 | HR | 18.01.2023 | IT | 18.01.2023 | LT | 18.01.2023 | LV | 18.01.2023 | MC | 18.01.2023 | NL | 18.01.2023 | RO | 18.01.2023 | RS | 18.01.2023 | SI | 18.01.2023 | SK | 18.01.2023 | SM | 18.01.2023 | NO | 18.04.2023 | GR | 19.04.2023 | IS | 18.05.2023 | PT | 18.05.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
IT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SI | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SK | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 18.01.2023 | |
DK | 18.01.2023 | ||
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
ES | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
GR | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
HR | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RS | 18.01.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 18.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1533881 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * paragraphs [0022] - [0100]; figures 1-4 *; | [XI]US2006139006 (WANG LIGONG [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9 * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] - [0011] - [0015] - [0 21] - [0037]; figure 4 * [I] 3,7,10; | [XI]US2008218130 (GUO JIANKUI [CN], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] - [0114]; figures 4,5 * [I] 6-12; | [A]US2013202918 (KIMURA DAISUKE [JP]) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0056] - [0063] *; | [X]EP3032633 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0073] - [0081] * | International search | [Y]JPH11196533 (MOTOROLA KK) [Y] 4, 6, 10-11, 15 * See paragraphs [7]-[21] and figures 1-2. *; | [A]JP2007020399 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * See the entire document. *; | [A]JP2009100596 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-16 * See the entire document. *; | [XY]JP2009247195 (O2MICRO INC) [X] 1-3, 5, 7-9, 12-14, 16 * See paragraphs [20]-[75] and figures 3-7. * [Y] 4, 6, 10-11, 15; | [A]KR20160135646 (RUBY CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-16* See the entire document. * |