EP3577781 - ADAPTIVE EXPLICIT CSI FEEDBACK AND OVERHEAD REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAO, Xiaomao Wanjiahuacheng 17, No. 1801 Pingshui Road Hangzhou 310000 / CN | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Mudge, Kevin Bryers Intellectual Property Ltd Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent Emersons Green Bristol BS16 7FR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 17895299.0 | 28.12.2017 | [2019/50] | WO2017FI50946 | Priority number, date | US201762453699P | 02.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762453699 P | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018142016 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3577781 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 09.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0452, H04B7/06, H04W72/04, H04B7/0456, H04B7/0417 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
H04B7/0626 (EP,US);
H04B7/0417 (US);
H04B7/0421 (EP);
H04B7/0456 (EP);
H04B7/0478 (US);
H04B7/0634 (EP);
H04B7/0639 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | H04B7/0452, H04B7/06, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE EXPLIZITE CSI-RÜCKKOPPLUNG UND OVERHEAD-REDUKTION | [2019/50] | English: | ADAPTIVE EXPLICIT CSI FEEDBACK AND OVERHEAD REDUCTION | [2019/50] | French: | RÉTROACTION DE CSI EXPLICITE ADAPTATIVE ET RÉDUCTION DE SURDÉBIT | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 04.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003068983 (KIM SUNG-JIN [KR], et al) [Y] 4,5,12,13* paragraphs [0079] , [0080] , [0120] , [0134]; figure 6; claims 1,2,7,55 *; | [XYI]US2003109226 (BRUNNER CHRISTOPHER [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0024] , [0026] , [0033] - [0036] - [0060] , [0061] , [0068] , [0092]; claim 17 * [Y] 4,5,12,13 [I] 6,9,14; | [X]WO2009003423 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraphs [0081] , [0082]; claims 1-3 *; | [XYI] - SAMSUNG AND SEOUL NATIONAL UNIVERSITY, "More than 2 antennas TxD: Extension for CL-MIMO, rev 2", 3GPP DRAFT; SCM-012-SAMSUNG-SYSMODEL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20020423), vol. RAN WG1, no. Paris, France; 20020423, XP050088020 [X] 1-3,7,8,10,11,15 * pages 4,5 * * figure 3 * [Y] 4,5,12,13 [I] 9 | International search | [A]US2010185716 (NAKAMURA YOSHIMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * Abstract, paragraphs [0035], [0040]-[0046], [0319]-[0323], [0378]-[0380]. *; | [XA]US2011002406 (MING JIA [CA], et al) [X] 1, 12, 20-21 * Abstract, paragraphs [0004]-[0005], [0046]-[0051]. * [A] 2-11, 13-19; | [YA]US2012099470 (LI DONG [CN], et al) [Y] 6, 16 * Abstract, paragraphs [0063], [0088], figure 2. * [A] 1-5, 7-15, 17-21; | [YA]US2012113897 (THIELE LARS [DE], et al) [Y] 5, 9, 15, 19 * Abstract, paragraphs [0056]-[0058], [0127]-[0129] * [A] 1-4, 6-8, 10-14, 16-18, 20-21; | [YA]US2013089040 (TABET TARIK [CA], et al) [Y] 10 * Abstract, paragraphs [0129]-[0140]. * [A] 1-9, 11-21; | [XYA]US2013201912 (SHENG HONGSAN [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 7-3, 12, 17-13, 20-21 * Abstract, paragraphs [0003]-[0006], [0067]-[0071], [0077]-[0084], [0100][0115], [0143]-[0151], [0162]-[0163], figures 6-7, 16. * [Y] 4-6, 9-10, 14-16, 19 [A] 3, 11, 13; | [XA]US2014056379 (JOENGREN GEORGE [SE], et al) [X] 1, 3, 12-13, 20-21 * Abstract, paragraphs [0049], [0054]-[0058], [0061]-[0064]. * [A] 2, 4-11, 14-19; | [YA]US2016134342 (KNECKT JARKKO [FI], et al) [Y] 4, 14 * Abstract, paragraphs [0036]-[0040], [0052]-[0054]. * [A] 1-3, 5-13, 15-21; | [A]WO2017004546 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * The whole document. *; | [A] - "Discussion of advanced CSI feedback", INTEL. R1-1609464, (20161009), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_86b/Docs/R1-1609464.zip, (20180316), XP051159535 [A] 1-21 * , The whole document. * | by applicant | US2003109226 | WO2009003423 | - "More than 2 antennas TxD: Extension for CL-MIMO, rev 2", 3GPP DRAFT; SCM-012-SAMSUNG-SYSMODEL, SAMSUNG AND SEOUL NATIONAL UNIVERSITY |