EP3420860 - SPLIT TYPE RICE COOKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Foshan Shunde Midea Electrical Heating Appliances Manufacturing Co., Limited San Le Road 19 Beijiao, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2023/21] |
Former [2019/01] | For all designated states Foshan Shunde Midea Electrical Heating Appliances Manufacturing Co., Limited 19 San Le Road Beijiao Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Zhixiao San Le Road 19 Beijiao Shunde Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Chuanbin San Le Road 19 Beijiao Shunde Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Xianhuai San Le Road 19 Beijiao Shunde Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | 04 /
FU, Zhengting San Le Road 19 Beijiao Shunde Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | 05 /
ZHU, Linbo San Le Road 19 Beijiao Shunde Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | 06 /
YUAN, Wei San Le Road 19 Beijiao Shunde Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | 07 /
CHEN, Wei San Le Road 19 Beijiao Shunde Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | 08 /
WU, Yuquan San Le Road 19 Beijiao Shunde Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/09] | Lam, Alvin Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | ||
Former [2019/01] | Lam, Alvin Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17895508.4 | 19.12.2017 | [2019/01] | WO2017CN117263 | Priority number, date | CN201720340935U | 31.03.2017 Original published format: CN 201720340935 U | CN201720340885U | 31.03.2017 Original published format: CN 201720340885 U | [2019/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018176931 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3420860 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3420860 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01G21/23, G01G19/52, A47J36/00, A47J27/00, // G01G23/00 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
G01G19/52 (EP);
A47J27/002 (KR);
A47J27/00 (EP);
A47J27/004 (KR);
A47J36/00 (EP);
G01G21/23 (EP);
G01G23/005 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/48] | A47J27/00, A47J36/00, G01G19/52, G01G23/00 | ||
Former IPC [2019/01] | A47J27/00, A47J36/00, G01G19/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETEILTER REISKOCHER | [2019/01] | English: | SPLIT TYPE RICE COOKER | [2019/01] | French: | CUISEUR À RIZ DE TYPE DIVISÉ | [2019/01] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2018 | Translation filed | 17.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 13.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2013158472 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,14,15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0056] * * figures 2, 4-7 * [I] 3,5-7,10-13; | [A]US2014008133 (CHAN PO SANG [HK]) [A] 5-7 * paragraph [0004]; figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] ** figures 1-7 * |