EP3572376 - APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING CARBON NANOTUBE AGGREGATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Foundation of Soongsil University-Industry Cooperation (Sangdo-dong) 369, Sangdo-ro Dongjak-gu Seoul 06978 / KR | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Young Jin (Ichon-dong Hyundai Apt.) 22-906 303 Ichon-ro Yongsan-gu Seoul 04424 / KR | 02 /
SONG, Hyeon Jun (Hwayang-dong) 26 Gunja-ro 4-gil Gwangjin-gu Seoul 05010 / KR | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2019/48] | Application number, filing date | 17895702.3 | 06.12.2017 | [2019/48] | WO2017KR14206 | Priority number, date | KR20170019586 | 13.02.2017 Original published format: KR 20170019586 | [2019/48] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018147538 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572376 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/16, B01J19/26, C01B32/164 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
C01B32/164 (EP);
C01B32/16 (EP,KR,US);
B01J6/008 (US);
B01J19/26 (EP,KR);
B01J4/002 (US);
C01B32/168 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/48] | C01B32/16, B01J19/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KOHLENSTOFFNANORÖHRCHENAGGREGATS | [2019/48] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING CARBON NANOTUBE AGGREGATE | [2019/48] | French: | APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION D'AGRÉGATS DE NANOTUBES DE CARBONE | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2019 | Translation filed | 20.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 01.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2236460 (NIKKISO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1, 2; claims 1-4 *; | [X]US2011142726 (SUGIYAMA EIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0166] - paragraph [0184]; figures 9, 10 *; | [X]JP2012046841 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-4; example 1 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] *; | [A]JP2006198463 (JFE STEEL KK) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028]; figures 2, 4 * | International search | [X]KR20100108599 (NIKKISO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * See abstract; paragraphs [0008], [0028]-[0032]; claims 1-3; and figures 1-2, 4. *; | [A]JP2012046841 (TEIJIN LTD) [A] 1-8 * See the entire document. *; | [A]KR101113758B (KONGJU NATIONAL UNIVERSITY INDUSTRY-UNIVERSITY COOPERATION FOUNDATION) [A] 1-8 * See the entire document. *; | [A]KR100646221B (SEOUL NATIONAL UNIVERSITY R&DB FOUNDATION) [A] 1-8 * See the entire document. *; | [A]KR101155057B (SAMSUNG CORNING PRECISION MATERIALS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-8 * See the entire document. *; | [A]JP2005350275 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-8 * See the entire document. * | by applicant | KR20160064103 |