EP3581669 - AUSTENITIC HEAT-RESISTANT ALLOY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEMBA, Hiroyuki c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
OKADA, Hirokazu c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIZAWA, Mitsuru c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 04 /
ONO, Toshihide c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 17895819.5 | 09.02.2017 | [2019/51] | WO2017JP04824 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018146783 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3581669 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C22C19/05, C21D8/00, C22C38/58, C22F1/10, C22C38/44, C22C38/48, C22C38/50 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
C21D8/005 (EP);
C22C19/05 (KR);
C22F1/16 (US);
C21D7/13 (KR);
C21D8/02 (KR);
C22C19/055 (EP);
C22C30/02 (US);
C22C38/44 (EP);
C22C38/48 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | C22C19/05, C21D8/00, C22C38/00, C22C38/58, C22F1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | AUSTENITISCHE WÄRMEBESTÄNDIGE LEGIERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/51] | English: | AUSTENITIC HEAT-RESISTANT ALLOY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2019/51] | French: | ALLIAGE RÉSISTANT À LA CHALEUR À BASE D'AUSTÉNITE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2019 | Translation filed | 30.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 16.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 09.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1357198 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [X] 4,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0050] * * example 7; table 1 * * example 7; table 2 * [I] 1-3; | [A]EP2781612 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JP2014012877 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP2479300 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2011063838 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-5 * , & US 2012/0168038 A1 & WO 2011/033856 A1 & EP 2479300 A1 *; | [A]JP2004003000 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-5 * , & US 2003/0198567 A1 & EP 1357198 A1 & CA 2425398 A1 & CN 1451778 A *; | [A]JP2016037664 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) [A] 1-5 * , (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPS61179833 | JPS61179834 | JPS61179835 | JPS61179836 | JP2004003000 |