EP3574775 - SUPPLY METHOD FOR LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6927 / JP | [2022/27] |
Former [2019/49] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco, Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Tomoichi c/o Japan Tobacco Inc. 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Hirofumi c/o Japan Tobacco Inc. 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 03 /
NAKANO, Takuma c/o Japan Tobacco Inc. 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 04 /
OISHI, Kei c/o Japan Tobacco Inc. 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/30] |
Former [2019/49] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17895985.4 | 08.02.2017 | [2019/49] | WO2017JP04487 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018146737 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3574775 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3574775 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, A24F40/10, A24F40/42 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
A24F40/485 (EP,US);
A24F15/015 (US);
A24F40/42 (EP,US);
A61M11/044 (US);
A24F40/10 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8206 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/49] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUFUHRVERFAHREN FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2019/49] | English: | SUPPLY METHOD FOR LIQUIDS | [2019/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ALIMENTATION EN LIQUIDES | [2019/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2019 | Translation filed | 27.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 08.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1618803 (HON LIK [CN]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1-10 *[I] 2-9; | [XI]WO2014195859 (LUCIANI MASSIMILIANO [IT], et al) [X] 1 * page 3 - page 14; figures 1-8a * [I] 2-9 | International search | [XY]JP2015506182 (Altria Client Services Inc.) [X] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0062] to [0075]; fig. 15 to 20 & WO 2013/116572 A1 paragraphs [0087] to [0100]; fig. 15 to 20 & US 2013/0192623 A1 & CA 2863189 A1 & CN 104219973 A * [Y] 3-9; | [Y]WO2015117704 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [Y] 3-9* , description, page 19, line 13 to page 20, line 19; page 23, lines 1 to 19; page 26, line 11 to page 27, line 5; fig. 4, 10, 14 to 15 & JP 2017-506509 A & US 2016/0345630 A1 & CA 2937980 A1 * | Examination | US2016213866 | by applicant | EP2941969 |