EP3582120 - TRANSLATION DEVICE AND TRANSLATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAEKI, Natsuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 17896047.2 | 11.10.2017 | [2019/51] | WO2017JP36743 | Priority number, date | JP20170020539 | 07.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017020539 | [2019/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018146864 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3582120 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/28, G06F17/27, G06F17/22 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
G06F40/131 (EP,US);
G06F40/58 (US);
G06F40/289 (EP,US);
G06F40/42 (EP,US);
G06F40/47 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | G06F17/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | ÜBERSETZUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ÜBERSETZUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/51] | English: | TRANSLATION DEVICE AND TRANSLATION METHOD | [2019/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRADUCTION | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2019 | Translation filed | 22.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 15.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.12.2022 | 09.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/52] | 19.08.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/52] | 13.12.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015186361 (SU TAO [CN], et al) [A] 1,10* abstract *; | [A] - TIMOTHY BALDWIN, "The hare and the tortoise: speed and accuracy in translation retrieval", MACHINE TRANSLATION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20100226), vol. 23, no. 4, ISSN 1573-0573, pages 195 - 240, XP019815892 [A] 1,10 * abstract * * section 2.1 * * section 2.2 * * section 3.2.2 * * section 5.2.3 * | International search | [A]JPH05290082 (IBM) [A] 1-10* , entire text, all drawings & US 5640575 A & EP 562818 A2 *; | [A]JPH10312382 (SHINODA KEIICHI) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006012168 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2006/0004560 A1 & GB 2415518 A & CN 1801141 A * |