EP3584526 - ROASTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bai, Hongmei Flat E, 17/F, BLK 1, Royal Ascot Fo Tan Hong Kong N.T. / CN | [2019/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/52] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 17896847.5 | 09.08.2017 | [2019/52] | WO2017CN96535 | Priority number, date | CN20171079213 | 14.02.2017 Original published format: CN201710079213 | [2019/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018149099 | Date: | 23.08.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3584526 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F26B17/20, F26B3/20, F27B7/10, F27B7/34 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
F26B23/028 (EP);
F26B17/34 (CN);
F26B17/20 (EP);
F26B21/001 (CN);
F26B21/004 (CN);
F26B25/00 (CN);
F26B25/002 (CN);
F26B25/007 (CN);
F26B25/04 (CN);
F26B25/16 (CN);
F26B3/24 (EP);
F27B7/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/52] | F26B17/18, F26B21/00, F26B3/24, F26B23/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Title | German: | RÖSTMASCHINE | [2019/52] | English: | ROASTING MACHINE | [2019/52] | French: | MACHINE DE RÔTISSAGE | [2019/52] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2018 | Translation filed | 24.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 14.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US1508555 (ARTHUR HULTS EUGENE) [X] 1 * page 1, line 78 - page 3, line 2; figure 1 * [Y] 4-10 [I] 2,3; | [A]US4276701 (TAKACS ISTVAN, et al) [A] 1-10* column 5, line 29 - column 7, line 54; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4430057 (HOOVER DONALD P [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 13; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US4761897 (TAZAKI MITSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 4,10 * column 4, line 11 - line 56 * * column 5, line 5 - line 27; figures 1-2,13,14 *; | [Y]JP2005331231 (MINOWA KOKI KK, et al) [Y] 6-9 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4376343 (WHITE HENRY J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2008295356 (NICKERSON ROBERT D [US]) [Y] 4-5 * , description, paragraphs [0040]-[0047], and figures 1-3 *; | [A]CN102216720 (THERMA FLITE INC) [A] 1-10* , entire document *; | [A]CN203011096U (WEIHUI XINCHANG MACHINERY MFG FACTORY) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [Y]CN103249818 (TEAL SALES INC) [Y] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0046]-[0080], and figures 2-11 *; | [A]CN105115265 (JIANG SHIJIE) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [Y]WO2017019449 (ARTISAN IND [US]) [Y] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0104]-[0145], and figures 3-17 * |