EP3535230 - IMPROVED PERFORMANCE OF TECHNICAL CERAMICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of The University of Colorado, A Body Corporate 1800 Grant Street, 8th Floor Denver, CO 80203 / US | For all designated states Bartel, Christopher 795 Gilpin Drive Boulder, CO 80303 / US | For all designated states Weimer, Alan, W. 6967 Springhill Drive Niwot, CO 80503 / US | For all designated states O'Toole, Rebecca, Jean 155 Shoshone Court Boulder, CO 80303 / US | For all designated states Kodas, Maila 135 Kimball Road Carlisle, MA 01741 / US | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTEL, Christopher 135 Kimball Road Carlisle, MA 01741 / US | 02 /
WEIMER, Alan, W. 135 Kimball Road Carlisle, MA 01741 / US | 03 /
O'TOOLE, Rebecca, Jean 135 Kimball Road Carlisle, MA 01741 / US | 04 /
KODAS, Maila 135 Kimball Road Carlisle, MA 01741 / US | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Zeuner Summerer Stütz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Nußbaumstraße 8 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/37] | Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17897326.9 | 04.11.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017US60066 | Priority number, date | US201662418666P | 07.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662418666 P | US201762520655P | 16.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762520655 P | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018156218 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3535230 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/106, C04B37/02, H01L23/06, H01M8/1253 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
C04B35/486 (EP,KR);
C04B35/4885 (US);
A61K6/818 (EP,KR);
A61K6/822 (EP,KR);
B33Y70/00 (KR);
C04B35/50 (EP,KR);
C04B35/565 (EP,KR);
C04B35/587 (EP,KR);
C04B35/624 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/62813 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/62847 (EP,KR);
C04B35/62855 (EP,KR);
C04B35/62884 (EP,KR);
C04B35/62897 (EP,KR);
C04B35/63416 (EP,KR);
C04B35/638 (EP,KR);
H01L23/06 (EP);
H01M8/1253 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/3217 (US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/3246 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/6021 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/6026 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/6565 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/9615 (EP,KR);
H01M2008/1293 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/37] | C04B35/106, C04B37/02, H01L23/06, A61K6/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE LEISTUNG VON TECHNISCHEN KERAMIKEN | [2019/37] | English: | IMPROVED PERFORMANCE OF TECHNICAL CERAMICS | [2019/37] | French: | PERFORMANCE AMÉLIORÉE DE CÉRAMIQUES TECHNIQUES | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 28.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 23.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.03.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5273942 (MCCAULEY RONALD A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,13 * whole document - see claims & examples * [I] 1; | [IA]US6613383 (GEORGE STEVEN M [US], et al) [I] 1-10,13-15 * col.1, l.50-67; col. 3, l.52-60, col.4, l.65-col.5, l.15, col.9, l.42-64 * [A] 11,12; | [XA]US2004224087 (WEIMER ALAN W [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10,15 * example 1 * [A] 5-7,11-14; | [I]US2011034319 (VILLALOBOS GUILLERMO R [US], et al) [I] 1 * whole document - but see in particular paragraph [0026] *; | [XA] - LUIS F HAKIM ET AL, "Conformal nanocoating of zirconia nanoparticles by atomic layer deposition in a fluidized bed reactor; Conformal nanocoating of zirconia nanoparticles by ALD in a fluidized bed reactor", NANOTECHNOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, GB, (20050701), vol. 16, no. 7, doi:10.1088/0957-4484/16/7/010, ISSN 0957-4484, pages S375 - S381, XP020091130 [X] 1,3,4,7-10,15 * whole document - but see in particular 2. Experimental Details, 3.2 Test for conformality, uniformity and composition of films, figures 5(a) & (b) * [A] 2,5,6,11-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-4484/16/7/010 | [T] - RADFORD K C ET AL, "Zirconia electrolyte cells", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE,, (19790101), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 59 - 65, XP001266652 [T] * 2. Experimental Procedures * | International search | [A]US5210455 (TAKEUCHI YUKIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-2* ; entire document *; | [X]US6613383 (GEORGE STEVEN M [US], et al) [X] 1-2 * ; Abstract, col 3 lines 35-37; lines 52-55, col 5 lines 52-55 *; | [A]US7799419 (BRULE ROBERT [CA], et al) [A] 1-2 * ; entire document *; | [A]US7811918 (DUTTA INDRANATH [US]) [A] 1-2 * ; col 4 lines 6-7 *; | [A]US2012132953 (BECKER DIRK [DE], et al) [A] 1-2 * ; entire document * | by applicant | US5273942 | US6613383 | US2004224087 | US2011034319 | - HAKIM et al., Nanotechnology, (20050000), vol. 16, no. 7, pages S375 - S381 |