EP3519125 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL (3D) PRINTING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/32] | THREE-DIMENSIONAL (3D) PRINTING | ||
[2021/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASPERCHIK, Vladek 1070 NE Circle Blvd. Corvallis Oregon 97330-4239 / US | 02 /
SHAARAWI, Mohammed S. 1070 NE Circle Blvd. Corvallis Oregon 97330-4239 / US | 03 /
MONROE, Michael G. 1070 NE Circle Blvd. Corvallis Oregon 97330-4239 / US | 04 /
INGLE, David Michael 16399 W. Bernardo Dr. San Diego California 92127-1899 / US | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/08] |
Former [2019/32] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17897438.2 | 24.02.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017US19298 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018156143 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3519125 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3519125 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 30.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B22F10/14, B29C64/165, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/00, B33Y40/20, B22F1/00, C22C1/04, // B33Y30/00, B33Y70/10, B22F5/08, B22F3/10 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
B22F10/14 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/05 (EP,US);
B22F1/10 (EP,US);
B22F10/10 (US);
B22F10/16 (EP,US);
B22F10/32 (EP,KR,US);
B22F10/34 (EP,KR,US);
B22F10/50 (KR,US);
B22F12/10 (US);
B22F12/53 (EP,KR,US);
B22F12/63 (KR,US);
B22F3/1021 (EP,US);
B29C64/165 (EP,KR,US);
B29C64/209 (US);
B29C64/295 (US);
B29C64/371 (KR,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,KR,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
B33Y40/20 (EP,KR);
B33Y70/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08L13/02 (US);
C22C1/0425 (EP,US);
B22F1/103 (EP,US);
B22F2201/013 (EP,US);
B22F2201/02 (EP,US);
B22F2201/04 (EP,US);
B22F2201/20 (EP,US);
B22F2304/10 (US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,KR,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,KR,US);
B22F3/10 (EP,US);
B22F3/1007 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F10/14, B22F3/10 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10, B22F10/14, B22F3/1007, B22F3/10, B22F3/24 (US,EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/1007, B22F3/1021, B22F2201/02, B22F2201/013 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/10, B22F2201/01 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/25] | B22F10/14, B29C64/165, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/00, B33Y40/20, B22F1/00, C22C1/04, // B33Y30/00, B33Y70/10, B22F5/08 | ||
Former IPC [2021/23] | B22F10/14, B22F3/10, B29C64/165, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/00, B33Y40/20, B22F1/00, // B33Y30/00, B33Y70/10, C22C1/04, B22F5/08 | ||
Former IPC [2021/21] | B22F10/14, B22F3/10, B22F7/02, B29C64/165, B29C64/295, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/00, B33Y40/20, B22F1/00, // B33Y30/00, B33Y70/10, C22C1/04, B22F5/08 | ||
Former IPC [2019/32] | B22F3/10, B22F7/02, B29C64/165, B29C64/295, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y70/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALES (3D) DRUCKVERFAHREN | [2021/27] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL (3D) PRINTING PROCESS | [2021/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE (3D) | [2021/25] |
Former [2019/32] | DREIDIMENSIONALES (3D) DRUCKEN | ||
Former [2019/32] | THREE-DIMENSIONAL (3D) PRINTING | ||
Former [2019/32] | IMPRESSION TRIDIMENSIONNELLE (3D) | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 10.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2017 | AL | 23.02.2022 | AT | 23.02.2022 | CY | 23.02.2022 | CZ | 23.02.2022 | DK | 23.02.2022 | EE | 23.02.2022 | ES | 23.02.2022 | FI | 23.02.2022 | HR | 23.02.2022 | IT | 23.02.2022 | LT | 23.02.2022 | LV | 23.02.2022 | MC | 23.02.2022 | MK | 23.02.2022 | NL | 23.02.2022 | PL | 23.02.2022 | RO | 23.02.2022 | RS | 23.02.2022 | SE | 23.02.2022 | SI | 23.02.2022 | SK | 23.02.2022 | SM | 23.02.2022 | IE | 24.02.2022 | LU | 24.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | BG | 23.05.2022 | NO | 23.05.2022 | GR | 24.05.2022 | IS | 23.06.2022 | PT | 23.06.2022 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
MK | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 23.02.2022 | |
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 23.02.2022 | |
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.02.2022 | |
NO | 23.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006045787 (JANDESKA WILLIAM F JR [US], et al); | [Y]US2015125334 (UETANI TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]US9133344 (GANAPATHIAPPAN SIVAPACKIA [US], et al); | [XY]WO2016053305 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) | International search | [Y]US3704275 (BURG KARLHEINZ, et al); | [Y]US2006045787 (JANDESKA WILLIAM F JR [US], et al); | [YA]US2015125334 (UETANI TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]US9550328 (DONALDSON PATRICIA J [US]); | [Y]US2017028475 (HEIKKILA KURT [US]) |