13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
02.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
02.04.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
24.12.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
26.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
18.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
23.04.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
20.04.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.04.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.04.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.12.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.05.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
01.05.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
08.04.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
13.12.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
01.11.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
01.11.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.08.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
28.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|