Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11071143 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2021 | B2 | US2020236708 | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710109477 | 27.02.2017 | WO2017CN87882 | 12.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108886816B | Global Dossier | 30.03.2021 | B | CN108886816 | 23.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710109477 | 27.02.2017 | WO2017CN87882 | 12.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3576481 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2021 | B1 | EP3576481 | 15.01.2020 | A4 | EP3576481 | 04.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710109477 | 27.02.2017 | WO2017CN87882 | 12.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018152985 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710109477 | 27.02.2017 |